This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 01:54:37 (UTC).

ESTHER NAM ET AL VS ALICIA KAWASAKI ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/15/2016 ESTHER NAM filed an Other lawsuit against ALICIA KAWASAKI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3395

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

NAM ESTHER

EKAN LLC

Defendants and Respondents

ECMU LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

MURATA ERIC

KAWASAKI ALICIA

Not Classified By Court

SINGER KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PETROHILOS LEE J. (PETROS)

PETROHILOS LEE JAMES

Defendant Attorney

GRANT HUGH JEFFREY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINT[FFTS TPIAL BRJEF

4/25/2018: PLAINT[FFTS TPIAL BRJEF

JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

4/25/2018: JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

5/9/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order

5/10/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/14/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S CLOSING ARCTUMENT BRIEF

5/21/2018: PLAINTIFF'S CLOSING ARCTUMENT BRIEF

TENTATIVE STATEMENT OF DECISION

7/27/2018: TENTATIVE STATEMENT OF DECISION

Minute Order

8/17/2018: Minute Order

Other -

12/6/2018: Other -

Notice of Ruling

12/11/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

4/18/2019: Minute Order

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

3/17/2016: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

4/6/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

4/6/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

4/6/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

SUPPELEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LEE J. "PETROS" PETROHILOS IN SUPPORT OF THE JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

6/30/2017: SUPPELEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LEE J. "PETROS" PETROHILOS IN SUPPORT OF THE JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

JOINT STATUS REPORT

8/31/2017: JOINT STATUS REPORT

PLAINTIFF'S STATUS REPORT RE MEDIATION

11/2/2017: PLAINTIFF'S STATUS REPORT RE MEDIATION

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kevin singer (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Oath of Receiver; Filed by Kevin singer (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Undertaking Under Section 562(b) C.C.P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Order (Proposed Order); Filed by Esther Nam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Esther Nam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Ekan, LLC (Plaintiff); Esther Nam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion - Other (for Appointment of Referee) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Other - (DEPARTMENT 19 - LAW AND MOTION RULINGS); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
131 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Ekan, LLC (Plaintiff); Esther Nam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES I. CANCELLATION OF WRITTEN INSTRUMENTS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Ekan, LLC (Plaintiff); Esther Nam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC613395    Hearing Date: November 13, 2019    Dept: 19

Plaintiffs Esther Nam and Ekan, LLC's Motion to Amend Judgment to Correct Clerical Error is GRANTED under Code of Civil Procedure section 473(d).  The motion is unopposed. Order signed this date.

Moving parties to give notice.