This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 03:48:54 (UTC).

ESTER SANDICO ET AL VS 1450 NORTH FAIR OAKS LLC

Case Summary

On 11/10/2015 ESTER SANDICO filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against 1450 NORTH FAIR OAKS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0661

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SANDICO ARLEN

SANDICO ESTER

Defendants and Respondents

1450 NORTH FAIR OAKS LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

GOLDEN CROSS HEALTH CARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MORAN LAW

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

POPPE-SMART KIMBERLI

WROTEN & ASSOCIATES INC.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL:: 1. ELDER ABUSE (WELFARE AND INSTITUTIONS CODE ? 15600, ET SEQ.); ETC

11/10/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL:: 1. ELDER ABUSE (WELFARE AND INSTITUTIONS CODE ? 15600, ET SEQ.); ETC

SUMMONS

11/10/2015: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/30/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/1/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT 1450 NORTH FAIR OAKS, LLC DBA GOLDEN CROSS HEALTH CARE'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

12/17/2015: DEFENDANT 1450 NORTH FAIR OAKS, LLC DBA GOLDEN CROSS HEALTH CARE'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

1/15/2016: PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

1/26/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/9/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

2/9/2016: PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/17/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2/23/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

NOTICE OF ERRATA TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

3/1/2016: NOTICE OF ERRATA TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order

3/2/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/22/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

8/31/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

10/5/2016: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/14/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

10/14/2016: Minute Order

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Motion for an Order (MOTION TO BIFURCATE) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (AS TO THE ENTIRE AND ALL PARTIES W/PREJ. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Notice (of withdrawal ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Notice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Motion for an Order (MOTION TO BIFURCATE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Notice of Continuance ( of FSC ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Notice of Continuance; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Notice (OF ERRATA TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND CMC STATEMENT; ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Answer to Complaint (1450 NORTH FAIR OAKS LLC ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2016
  • Receipt; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • at 08:35 am in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - Overruled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Reply/Response; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Opposition Document; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Defendant's Demurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1450 NORTH FAIR OAKS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABIITY COMPANY DBA GOLDEN CROS HEALTH CARE is a litigant