Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 09:56:47 (UTC).

ESTEBAN PENA VS SHANTO'S BAKERY ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/01/2013 ESTEBAN PENA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SHANTO'S BAKERY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2998

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PENA ESTEBAN

Defendants and Respondents

ADESSIAN SHAUNT [DOE 1]

DOE SHANTO

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

KHATCHATURIAN HOVIK

SHANTO'S BAKERY

SHANTO'S BAKERY CORP.

BAKERY SHANTO'S

Cross Plaintiff

YACOUBIAN SERINE

Cross Defendants

ADESSIAN HAROUT

ADESSIAN KIMBERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MANCINI & ASSOCIATES A PROF. LAW CORP.

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

WADE DOUGLAS M. LAW OFFICES

EYTAN MATTANIAH LAW OFFICES OF

FASEL & ASSOCIATES

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

FASEL & ASSOCIATES

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

EYTAN MATTANIAH LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

10/29/2013: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF RULING AT OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/13/2014: NOTICE OF RULING AT OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

3/7/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF TRIAL

3/21/2014: NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF TRIAL

CROSS-DEFENDANT SHANTO?S BAKERY, CORP.?S NOTICE OI? HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY AND/OR DISMISS PROCEEDING AND DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/1/2014: CROSS-DEFENDANT SHANTO?S BAKERY, CORP.?S NOTICE OI? HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY AND/OR DISMISS PROCEEDING AND DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-DEFENDANT SHANTO?S BAKERY, CORP.?S REPLY TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY AND/OR DISMISS PROCEEDING AND DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/10/2014: CROSS-DEFENDANT SHANTO?S BAKERY, CORP.?S REPLY TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY AND/OR DISMISS PROCEEDING AND DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

TENTATIVE RULING

6/18/2014: TENTATIVE RULING

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT BY SHAUNT ADESSIAN, SERINE YACOUBIAN, HAROUT ADESSIAN AND KIMBERLY ADESSIAN

9/3/2014: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT BY SHAUNT ADESSIAN, SERINE YACOUBIAN, HAROUT ADESSIAN AND KIMBERLY ADESSIAN

STIPULATION RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE

9/29/2014: STIPULATION RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE

REPLY TO SHANTO?S BAKERY CORP.?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

12/8/2014: REPLY TO SHANTO?S BAKERY CORP.?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL SHKLOVSKY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SHANTO'S BAKERY, CORP.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [C.C.P. ? 437C]

1/30/2015: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL SHKLOVSKY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SHANTO'S BAKERY, CORP.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [C.C.P. ? 437C]

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

2/5/2015: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order -

7/8/2015: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/20/2015: Minute Order -

CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR NOTICE AND SERVICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL EXPERT DEPOSITIONS OR FOR ORDER TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY AT TRIAL

7/20/2015: CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR NOTICE AND SERVICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL EXPERT DEPOSITIONS OR FOR ORDER TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RULING AT EX PARTE HEARUBG

7/22/2015: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RULING AT EX PARTE HEARUBG

DECLARATION OF SAMUEL J. TREANOR EN SUPPORT OF SHANTO'S BAKERY, CORP.'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF ROMINA KELATCHATURIAN

7/30/2015: DECLARATION OF SAMUEL J. TREANOR EN SUPPORT OF SHANTO'S BAKERY, CORP.'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF ROMINA KELATCHATURIAN

Minute Order -

7/31/2015: Minute Order -

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; (OSC RE Dismissal; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Docketat 2:15 PM in Department 72; Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Shanto's Bakery (Defendant); Shanto's Bakery, Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 72; (Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 72; (Motion to Compel; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLA1NANT AND CROSS- DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S OPPOSITION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF ROMINA KHATCHATURIAN; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketReply/Response; Filed by Adessian, Shaunt [Doe 1] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
219 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2013
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • DocketProof-Personal Service; Filed by Esteban Pena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Esteban Pena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) PERCEIVED AND/OR PHYSICAL I)ISABILITY DISCRIMINATION, HARASSMENT, AND RETALIATION IN VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CODE 1294O ET SEQ.; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Esteban Pena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less