Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2016 at 17:38:09 (UTC).

ESTEBAN BORRERO VS ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 04/05/2012 ESTEBAN BORRERO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, MARGARET M. BERNAL, ELIA WEINBACH and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0869

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

MARGARET M. BERNAL

ELIA WEINBACH

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BORRERO ESTEBAN

BORRERO JORGE

RODRIGUEZ ANA LUISA ESTATE OF

RODRIGUEZ JESUS CRUZ

Defendants

ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC

HIFUMI GLENN T. M.D.

SINGH AMRIT M.D.

CHARLES K. SANGMOAH PA-C

ARINDER S. CHADHA M.D. -DOE 1

MOUSTAFA EL ALAMY M.D. -DOE 4

CHARLES K. SANGMOAH PA-C -DOE 2

NORWALK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

ALTO LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS INC.

BHARAT N. CHAUHAN M.D. -DOE 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD NEIL M. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD STOCKALPER

HAMILTON JEFFERI J. LAW OFFICES OF

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

ARTIANO & ASSOCIATES APC

SCHMID & VOILES

CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN & MCKENNA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/22/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

RULING RE: 1. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT BHARATKUMAR CHAUHAN, M.D. 2. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT, MOUSTAFA EL ALAMY, M.D. (DOE 4)

4/11/2013: RULING RE: 1. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT BHARATKUMAR CHAUHAN, M.D. 2. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT, MOUSTAFA EL ALAMY, M.D. (DOE 4)

DECLARATION OF MOSES FALLAS, M.D., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/19/2013: DECLARATION OF MOSES FALLAS, M.D., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/22/2013: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORIGINAL PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

4/22/2013: ORIGINAL PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

NOTICE OF ERRATA

4/24/2013: NOTICE OF ERRATA

Minute Order

5/16/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/1/2013: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS, INC. DBA NORWALK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL; AND NOTICE RE FUTURE CALENDAR DATES/TIMES RE FSC AND TRIAL

7/2/2013: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS, INC. DBA NORWALK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL; AND NOTICE RE FUTURE CALENDAR DATES/TIMES RE FSC AND TRIAL

ORDER

7/3/2013: ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

7/3/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order

7/15/2013: Minute Order

RULING RE: 1.MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DE FENDANT, ARINDER CHADHA, M.D.

7/15/2013: RULING RE: 1.MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DE FENDANT, ARINDER CHADHA, M.D.

MOTION IN LIMINE #2 - DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF?S EXPERTS TO THOSE OPINIONS EXPRESSED AT DEPOSITION; ETC

7/18/2013: MOTION IN LIMINE #2 - DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF?S EXPERTS TO THOSE OPINIONS EXPRESSED AT DEPOSITION; ETC

MOTION IN LIMINE #3 - DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DISCUSSIONS OF MICRA LIMITATIONS; ETC

7/18/2013: MOTION IN LIMINE #3 - DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DISCUSSIONS OF MICRA LIMITATIONS; ETC

DECLARATION OF CHRISTY L. THOMASSON ESQ. PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3.57

7/18/2013: DECLARATION OF CHRISTY L. THOMASSON ESQ. PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3.57

ORDER RE: DEFENDANT DR. ARINDER S. CHADHA?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/30/2013: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT DR. ARINDER S. CHADHA?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/21/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (entire action w/ prej ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • Order (RE: DEFENDANT CHARLES K. SANGMOAH, PA-C'S MSJ ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • Order (RE: DEFENDANT DR. ARINDER S. CHADHA'S MSJ ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • Order (DR. CHAUHAN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFT MOUSTAFA EL ALAMY, M.D.'S MSJ ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • Partial Dismissal W/out Prejudice (AS TO DEFT, AMRIT SINGH, M.D. ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEMS, LLC DBA NORWALK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • Request-Waive Court Fees (AS TO ESTEBAN BORRERO ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORWALK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC is a litigant