This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2021 at 16:56:58 (UTC).

ESTATE OF MATTHEW STEVEN BARKER VS. MYLAN INC.,

Case Summary

On 06/10/2010 ESTATE OF MATTHEW STEVEN BARKER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MYLAN INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART, AMY D. HOGUE, JOSEPH DE VANON, MARY THORNTON HOUSE, SAMANTHA P. JESSNER, JAN A. PLUIM and REFERENCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5404

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

AMY D. HOGUE

JOSEPH DE VANON

MARY THORNTON HOUSE

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

JAN A. PLUIM

REFERENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

ESTATE OF MATTHEW STEVEN MARKER

BY & THROUGH ITS REP. SMITH MARILYN

BARKER ABIGAIL

ESTATE OF BARKER MATTHEW STEVEN

SMITH MARILYN M.

Defendants, Respondents and Appellants

GARZA CARI EILEEN

ESTATE OF BARKER MATTHEW STEVEN

MYLAN BERTEK PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

JOSEPH DANVENPORT

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES U.S.A. INC

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

AURORA LAS ENCINAS HOSPITAL

AURORA BEHAVIOR HEALTH/LAS ENCINAS(DOE 1)

MYLAN INC.

AURORA LAS ENCINAS LLC

MYLAN BERTEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

MOTOLA ROBIN

HARAZATI JOSEPH M.D.

Others

MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP

HANGER STEINBERG SHAPIRO & ASH

SMITH MARILYN M. LAW OFFICE OF

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMITH MARILYN M. LAW OFFICE OF

LAW OFFICE OF ANA C. SCHNEIDER

LAW OFFICE OF LISA FISHER

OKOROCHA OKORIE

MCCORMICK BARSTOW SHEPPARD WAYLE& CARRUTH

LAW OFFICE OF FISHER LISA

LAW OFFICES OF MARILYN M. SMITH

MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP

FISHER LISA

SMITH MARILYN MARGARET

OKOROCHA OKORIE CHUKWUDIMMA

Defendant Attorneys

ROGERS JAMES R. LAW OFFICES OF

HANGER STEINBERG SHAPIRO & ASH

CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN & MCKENN

O'HAGAN SPENCER LLP

CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN & MCKENNA

SHAPIRO MARC STEVEN

FRANZEN MARK VICTOR

ROGERS JAMES RICHARD

SENIOR JULIAN GALLUS

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

8/1/2011: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

8/26/2011: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

Notice of Ruling

10/6/2011: Notice of Ruling

Separate Statement

11/4/2011: Separate Statement

Case Management Statement

1/4/2012: Case Management Statement

Separate Statement

11/29/2012: Separate Statement

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

3/28/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2013-10-15 00:00:00

10/15/2013: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2013-10-15 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

11/5/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2014-11-07 00:00:00

11/7/2014: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2014-11-07 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2015-03-23 00:00:00

3/23/2015: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2015-03-23 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

9/4/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY BRIEF

9/14/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY BRIEF

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

9/23/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

10/6/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STIPULATION

11/24/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STIPULATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF RECORD

3/29/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF RECORD

Opposition - OPPOSITION EXHIBIT 7 OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS

6/28/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION EXHIBIT 7 OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS

713 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • Hearing01/08/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Hearing on Motion - Other Approve the Parties Stipulation to Vacate the Judgment, etc. Filed by Pltff Estate of Matthew Steven Barker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Approve the Parties Stipulation to Vacate the Judgment, etc. Filed by Pltff Estate of Matthew Steven Barker) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Approve the Parties Stipulation to ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B300969); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketMotion re: (Approve the Parties Stipulation to Vacate the Judgment); Filed by ESTATE OF BARKER, MATTHEW STEVEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 10/09/19-X B300969); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Court's Order Re Stipulation to Reserve Jurisdiction); Filed by ESTATE OF BARKER, MATTHEW STEVEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 4:06 PM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/31/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1,160 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ESTATE OF BARKER, MATTHEW STEVEN (Plaintiff); Estate of Matthew Steven Barker (Plaintiff); BY & THROUGH ITS REP. SMITH, MARILYN (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department S, JOSEPH DE VANON, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2010-11-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ESTATE OF BARKER, MATTHEW STEVEN (Plaintiff); Estate of Matthew Steven Barker (Plaintiff); BY & THROUGH ITS REP. SMITH, MARILYN (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: GC045404    Hearing Date: November 06, 2020    Dept: A

Motion to approve stipulation

This matter has numerous and multi-faceted problem which the court will discuss at the time of hearing.