This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 17:49:04 (UTC).

ESTATE OF HYO SEOK CHANG VS. WESTERN FREIGHT CARRIER, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2012 ESTATE OF HYO SEOK CHANG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WESTERN FREIGHT CARRIER, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, AMY D. HOGUE, ELIA WEINBACH and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6528

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

AMY D. HOGUE

ELIA WEINBACH

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHANG WON A.

CHANG WOO

ESTATE OF HYO SEOK CHANG

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

LEE YANG YE

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 100

HUANTE JORGE SERGIO

WESTERN FREIGHT CARRIER INC.

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN RICHARD D. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

Other Attorneys

ROBERSON KIMBALL & JALTOROSIAN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/3/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/3/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order

11/8/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMEN TO P1 COURT

3/28/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMEN TO P1 COURT

SEPARATELY BOUND VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/3/2013: SEPARATELY BOUND VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CUTOFF DATES

7/30/2013: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CUTOFF DATES

NOTICE OF AMENDED HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOB SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/13/2013: NOTICE OF AMENDED HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOB SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order

10/29/2013: Minute Order

RULING RE: DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

7/31/2013: RULING RE: DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANTS? EXPARTE APPLICATION TO SET THE HEARING DATE ON THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FOR JULY 19, 2013 OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO SHORTEN THE 30 DAY PRE-TRIAL TIME PERIOD TO HEAR THE MOTION; DE

5/13/2013: DEFENDANTS? EXPARTE APPLICATION TO SET THE HEARING DATE ON THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FOR JULY 19, 2013 OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO SHORTEN THE 30 DAY PRE-TRIAL TIME PERIOD TO HEAR THE MOTION; DE

NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FOR JULY 19, 2013 OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SHORTENING THE 30 I)AY PRETRIAL TIME PER

5/13/2013: NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FOR JULY 19, 2013 OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SHORTENING THE 30 I)AY PRETRIAL TIME PER

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/29/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

7/31/2013: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS? PROPOSED STATEMENT OF THE CASE

10/24/2013: DEFENDANTS? PROPOSED STATEMENT OF THE CASE

ORDER

7/30/2013: ORDER

FILING OF ORIGINAL PROOFS OF SERVICE PERSONALLY SERVED UPON LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD D. HOFFMAN AND ROBERSON KIMBALL & JALTOROSIAN RE: DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION DEFENDANTS? M

5/7/2013: FILING OF ORIGINAL PROOFS OF SERVICE PERSONALLY SERVED UPON LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD D. HOFFMAN AND ROBERSON KIMBALL & JALTOROSIAN RE: DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION DEFENDANTS? M

DEFENDANTS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/3/2013: DEFENDANTS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY PARTY FROM REFERENCING OR ADMITTING ANY EVIDENCE OF INTRODUCING GRAPHIC PHOTOGRAPHS OF DECEDENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW HARRISON;

10/24/2013: MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY PARTY FROM REFERENCING OR ADMITTING ANY EVIDENCE OF INTRODUCING GRAPHIC PHOTOGRAPHS OF DECEDENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW HARRISON;

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2014
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Order (RULING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • Stipulation (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • Order (ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Reply/Response Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Objection Document Filed (TO THE DECL. OF LESTER M. ZACKER, M.D.; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Response Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Opposition Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Proof of Service ( re: conformed copy of Request for Dismissal ) Filed by Plaintiff in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Answer to ComplaintInIntervention Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons (& COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION; SATEMENT OF DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons (& COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION; STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • Complaint in Intervention Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • Summons Issued Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.