This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 02:12:02 (UTC).

ESPINOZA BARAJAS, HILDA VS ARIAS, JAVIER

Case Summary

On 10/11/2016 ESPINOZA BARAJAS, HILDA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ARIAS, JAVIER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SHORT, MICHELLE and GELFOUND, DAVID B.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3630

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SHORT, MICHELLE

GELFOUND, DAVID B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ESPINOZA BARAJAS HILDA

Respondent

ARIAS JAVIER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Submitted for signaturer F48 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; FCCR Conference - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Proof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2016
  • Declaration (Com Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Espinoza Barajas, Hilda ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Espinoza Barajas, Hilda ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Statement - Financial (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Espinoza Barajas, Hilda ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Declaration (Sep Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Espinoza Barajas, Hilda ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Espinoza Barajas, Hilda ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.