Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 13:39:09 (UTC).

ERNESTINA DE LA TORRE VS. RAMON GARCIA

Case Summary

On 12/24/2013 ERNESTINA DE LA TORRE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RAMON GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAUL A. SAHAGUN and ROGER ITO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3722

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

ROGER ITO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CONSUELO MENDOZA

DE LA TORRE ERNESTINA

LOZA-MENDOZA JUAN

LOZA-MENDOZA LOURDES

MENDOZA JUAN

MENDOZA PEDRO

MENDOZA-DE LA TORRE ALBERTO

MENDOZA-DE LA TORRE GLORIA ESTELLA

MENDOZA-DE LA TORRE MARIA DE JESUS

MENDOZA-DE LA TORRE MARICELA

MENDOZA-QUEZADA BLANCA ESTELA

MENDOZA-QUEZADA JULIUS CESAR

MENDOZA-QUEZADA MAYRA ELENA

MIRANDA-LARA LEOPOLDO

MIRANDA-MENDOZA ADRIAN ALBERTO

SAUCEDO ERNESTINA

MENDOZA QUEZADA TERESA ANGELINA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GARCIA RAMON

PMC BANCORP A CALIFORNIA CORP.

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUSSELL L. DAVIS ESQ

DAVIS RUSSELL LOWELL

Defendant Attorneys

FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

SWATT PATRICIA LYNN

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAZARAN MARY ANNE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/24/2013: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/24/2013: Complaint

Declaration - Declaration Declaration od Service of Ramon Garcia

4/3/2014: Declaration - Declaration Declaration od Service of Ramon Garcia

Summons

5/5/2014: Summons

Request for Dismissal

9/25/2015: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

10/8/2015: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2015-10-08 00:00:00

10/8/2015: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2015-10-08 00:00:00

Order for Publication

11/2/2015: Order for Publication

Notice of Appearance

12/21/2015: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-01-14 00:00:00

1/14/2016: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-01-14 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Default Entered

4/8/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Default Entered

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-05-11 00:00:00

5/11/2016: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-05-11 00:00:00

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/22/2016: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-09-07 00:00:00

9/7/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-09-07 00:00:00

Minute Order

5/8/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

12/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

8/7/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: DISMISSAL

11/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: DISMISSAL

141 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • Hearing01/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Hearing01/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: regarding disposition of the cross complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Hearing01/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by RAMON GARCIA (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Default Prove Up Hearing (as to the cross complaint filed 1/21/15) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (as to settled parties) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (as to settled parties) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Default Prove Up Hearing (as to the cross complaint filed 1/21/15) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
223 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2014
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by RAMON GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration od Service of Ramon Garcia)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • DocketNotice; Filed by ERNESTINA DE LA TORRE (Plaintiff); MARICELA MENDOZA-DE LA TORRE (Plaintiff); GLORIA ESTELLA MENDOZA-DE LA TORRE (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • DocketDefendant's Demurrer; Filed by RAMON GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ERNESTINA DE LA TORRE (Plaintiff); MARICELA MENDOZA-DE LA TORRE (Plaintiff); GLORIA ESTELLA MENDOZA-DE LA TORRE (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JULIUS CESAR MENDOZA-QUEZADA (Plaintiff); JUAN LOZA-MENDOZA (Plaintiff); JESUS LOZA RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF PAWLO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAZARAN MARY A.