Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 06:05:40 (UTC).

ERIKA HECKMAN VS MILLIE & SEVERSON, INC.-ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/28/2009 ERIKA HECKMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MILLIE SEVERSON, INC -. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN F. GASDIA, RAUL A. SAHAGUN and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3422

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN F. GASDIA

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HECKMAN ERIKA

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DELTA PIPELINE INC.

MILLIE & SEVERSON INC.

MASONRY GROUP CALIFORNIA INC. THE

PRESBYTERIAN INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL

CREW INC.

WHITTIER CITY OF

Intervenor

INTERSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDBERG BARRY P.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

EHRET CHRISTENSEN LLP

FONDA & FRASER

SKEBBA & ISAAC LAW OFFICES OF

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

NELSON & GRIFFIN

JONES & MAYER

ZIMMERMAN & KAHANOWITCH

13 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSALPER M/O 10-29-10) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal (CCP664.6 WITHOUT PREJUDICE ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • DocketPartial Dismissal W/out Prejudice; Filed by MILLIE & SEVERSON, INC. (Legacy Party); PRESBYTERIAN INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • DocketPartial Dismissal W/out Prejudice (X/C BY MILLIE & SEVERSON AND PRESBYTERIAN INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL FILED 5/17/10 AND MILLIE & SEVERSON FILED 6/8/09 W/O PREJ); Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2010
  • DocketPartial Dismissal W/out Prejudice (CMPLNT-IN-INTERVENTION W/O PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2010
  • DocketPartial Dismissal W/out Prejudice; Filed by INTERSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • DocketPartial Dismissal With Prejudice (COMPLAINT (RFD PLACED IN FILE 11/23/10) W PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
223 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2009
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • DocketCross-complaint filed; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DELTA PIPELINE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WHITTIER CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where DESIGN MASONRY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MILLIE AND SEVERSON INC. is a litigant