This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2020 at 09:23:17 (UTC).

ERICA JANETTE AVALOS VS. MARIO ALBERTO DELGADO

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 ERICA JANETTE AVALOS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARIO ALBERTO DELGADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0714

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AVALOS ERICA JANETTE

Respondent

DELGADO MARIO ALBERTO

 

Court Documents

Judgment

5/24/2017: Judgment

Minute Order

5/24/2017: Minute Order

Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

5/26/2017: Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

5/30/2017: Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2017
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department N, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Judgment - Default After Prove Up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketNunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department N, (Department, CMN), Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketNunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department N, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Default Prove Up Trial - Granted - As Stipulated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Avalos, Erica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketMilestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 01-19-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Avalos, Erica - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketProperty Declaration (Community and Quasi-Community - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Avalos, Erica - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Avalos, Erica - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketSummons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Avalos, Erica - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketPetition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Avalos, Erica - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Avalos, Erica - Granted on 2016-11-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Avalos, Erica - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketProperty Declaration (Separate - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Avalos, Erica - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less