This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 00:46:01 (UTC).

ERICA EPHEDRA, LLC VS. FRED BUCKLEY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/19/2015 ERICA EPHEDRA, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FRED BUCKLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4320

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

EPHEDRA ERICA LLC A CAL. LTD LIAB. COMP

BOULDER INVESTMENT & REALTY COMPANY

ERICA EPHEDRA LLC A CALIF. LTD. LIAB.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BUCKLEY CORINNE

MEN'S TESTOSTERONE CENTER AN ENTITY UNKN

BUCKLEY FRED

Cross Defendants

MORRISON DALE

ERICA EPHEDRA LLC A CALIF. LTD. LIAB.

EE LLC A CALIF. LTD. LIAB. COMPANY

MORRISON YEN SHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRIMUTH & DRISKELL LLP

Defendant Attorneys

NEWPORT TRIAL GROUP

KULIK GOTTSMAN SIEGEL & WARE LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Erica Ephedra, LLC, a Calif. Ltd. Liab. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Long Cause; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department A; Court Order (Court Order; Trial continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by Men's Testosterone Center, an entity unkn (Legacy Party); Fred Buckley (Defendant); Corinne Buckley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for an Order; Off Calendar - Moving Party) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Erica Ephedra, LLC, a Calif. Ltd. Liab. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Men's Testosterone Center, an entity unkn (Legacy Party); Fred Buckley (Defendant); Corinne Buckley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Men's Testosterone Center, an entity unkn (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by Men's Testosterone Center, an entity unkn (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Men's Testosterone Center, an entity unkn (Legacy Party); Fred Buckley (Defendant); Corinne Buckley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (OSC-Failure to File Misc. Docs; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Men's Testosterone Center, an entity unkn (Legacy Party); Fred Buckley (Defendant); Corinne Buckley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Boulder Investment & Realty Company (Legacy Party); Erica Ephedra, LLC, a Calif. Ltd. Liab. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Boulder Investment & Realty Company (Legacy Party); Erica Ephedra, LLC, a Calif. Ltd. Liab. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Boulder Investment & Realty Company (Legacy Party); Erica Ephedra, LLC, a Calif. Ltd. Liab. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.