Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2020 at 19:48:39 (UTC).

ERIC KESSLER VS TRENCH PLATE RENTAL CO ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/31/2015 ERIC KESSLER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TRENCH PLATE RENTAL CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2530

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KESSLER ERIC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

PERELLA-WEINBERG PARTNERS LP

TRENCH PLATE RENTAL CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FREIMAN LAW

LAW FREIMAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HOLLOMAN LINDSAY M. ESQ.

SHEPPARD MULLIN ET AL. LLP [SAN DIEGO]

SHEPPARD MULLIN ET AL. LLP [LOS ANGELES]

DIEGO] SHEPPARD MULLIN ET AL. LLP [SAN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

9/9/2015: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

10/8/2015: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

10/20/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/20/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT PERELLA-WEINBERG PARTNERS LP'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

10/30/2015: DEFENDANT PERELLA-WEINBERG PARTNERS LP'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

12/8/2015: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

12/24/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

1/5/2016: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL CIVIL COURT PROCEEDINGS

3/10/2016: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL CIVIL COURT PROCEEDINGS

DECLARATION OF RICCARDO BENEDETTI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL CIVIL COURT PROCEEDINGS

3/10/2016: DECLARATION OF RICCARDO BENEDETTI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL CIVIL COURT PROCEEDINGS

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL CIVIL COURT PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

3/10/2016: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL CIVIL COURT PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

3/21/2016: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

PROOF OF HAND DELIVERY

4/1/2016: PROOF OF HAND DELIVERY

Minute Order -

4/4/2016: Minute Order -

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/4/2016: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

4/4/2016: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order -

8/26/2016: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

8/26/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17; Post-Arbitration Status Conference (Conference-Post Arbitration Status; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eric Kessler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17; Status Conference (Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17; (Motion to Compel; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Trench Plate Rental Co. (Defendant); Perella-Weinberg Partners LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Eric Kessler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME COMPENSATION (CAL LAB. CODE SS. 510, 1194, 1194.2, 1197, 1198); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eric Kessler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Perella Weinberg Partners Capital Management LP is a litigant

Latest cases where TRENCH PLATE RENTAL CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLLOMAN LINDSAY M.