This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 15:09:07 (UTC).

ERGWINS MATA ET AL VS ARSUAL INVESTMENT ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/25/2016 ERGWINS MATA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ARSUAL INVESTMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FREDERICK C. SHALLER and SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8242

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GONZALEZ FRANCISCO LOPEZ

MATA ERGWINS

Defendants and Respondents

NARINYAN ARMAN

DOES 1-50

ARSUAL INVESTMENT

CLASSIC CAR WASH

GORBUSHKA LLC AN LIMITED LIABILITY CO

HARUTYUNYAN ARPINE

ORBUSHKA LLC

Other

WOLFLICK & SIMPSON LAW OFFICES OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MOON & YANG APC

FEGHALI ALLEN VICTOR

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ROSENFIELD SHELDON LAW O/O

KAZARYAN MARGARIT

WOLFLICK GREGORY DONALD

STEPANYAN IZABELLA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/9/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

5/23/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Unknown

5/29/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR: 1.WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE; ETC.

8/31/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR: 1.WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE; ETC.

SUMMONS

4/25/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/9/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/15/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 1ST AMENDED

8/15/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 1ST AMENDED

Unknown

9/14/2016: Unknown

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

12/29/2016: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/27/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

3/9/2017: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order

3/9/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/12/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

7/18/2017: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

8/29/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Ergwins Mata (Plaintiff); Francisco Lopez Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Ergwins Mata (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Case Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Notice of Status of Bankruptcy Proceedings; Filed by Arsual Investment (Defendant); Arman Narinyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Ergwins Mata (Plaintiff); Francisco Lopez Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2016
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ergwins Mata (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ergwins Mata (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ergwins Mata (Plaintiff); Francisco Lopez Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Ergwins Mata (Plaintiff); Francisco Lopez Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less