Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 14:12:49 (UTC).

ERASMO OCHAVO VS MOLINA HEALTHCARE INC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2015 ERASMO OCHAVO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MOLINA HEALTHCARE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1325

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

OCHAVO ERASMO

ADDO BELINDA

GOMEZ PABLO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

MOLINA HEALTHCARE INC.

COLLEGE HEALTH ENTERPRISES

CHLB LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MAHONEY LAW GROUP APC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

KAHANA AMIR M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND RESTITUTION 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES; ETC.

8/17/2015: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND RESTITUTION 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES; ETC.

Answer

10/27/2016: Answer

Order - Dismissal

12/8/2016: Order - Dismissal

Notice of Postponement

2/7/2017: Notice of Postponement

Notice of Related Case

3/24/2017: Notice of Related Case

Objection

3/28/2017: Objection

Notice

5/22/2017: Notice

Stipulation - No Order

5/24/2017: Stipulation - No Order

Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

6/5/2017: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

Supplemental Declaration

6/7/2017: Supplemental Declaration

Other -

6/22/2017: Other -

Minute Order

6/27/2017: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

6/29/2017: Notice of Ruling

Supplemental Declaration

7/10/2017: Supplemental Declaration

Notice of Ruling

8/14/2017: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/13/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration

10/13/2017: Declaration

Minute Order

12/13/2017: Minute Order

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 6; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Erasmo Ochavo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Declaration DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE MOLINA OF ILYM GROUP, INC., REGARDING DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Notice of Postponement NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by BELINDA ADDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Notice NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 323; Fairness Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Default Judgment -JUDGEMENT AND ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Erasmo Ochavo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Erasmo Ochavo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 323; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Stipulation; Filed by Molina Healthcare, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Erasmo Ochavo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Erasmo Ochavo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Erasmo Ochavo (Plaintiff); PABLO GOMEZ (Plaintiff); BELINDA ADDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND RESTITUTION 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • at 08:32 AM in Department Legacy; Unknown event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHLB LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COLLEGE HEALTH ENTERPRISES is a litigant

Latest cases where Molina Healthcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHANA AMIR MOSHE