This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 09:45:20 (UTC).

ERA FRANCHISE SYSTEMS VS LBH NATIONAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/22/2016 ERA FRANCHISE SYSTEMS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LBH NATIONAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STUART M. RICE and ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1137

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STUART M. RICE

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ERA FRANCHISE SYSTEMS LLC

ROES 1-10

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-10

ROGER A. HERMAN

LBH NATIONAL CORPORATION

HERMAN ROGER A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AARON P. RUDIN

DANIEL M. ELIADES

Defendant Attorney

LEWITT HACKMAN HOEFFLIN SHAPIRO &MARSHALL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Status Conference (Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Stipulated Judgment (AS TO LBH National Corp. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Stipulated Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by ERA FRANCHISE SYSTEMS LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other (STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Notice of Ruling (RE OS RE STATUS OF BANKRPUTCY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (Conference-Bankruptcy Status; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department B, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Conference-Bankruptcy Status (AS TO LBH NATIONAL CORP.----------------------------------AND/OR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE----------------------------------STIP. JGMT AS TO ROGER HERMAN) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
175 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2016
  • Notice; Filed by ERA FRANCHISE SYSTEMS LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Application ; Filed by ERA FRANCHISE SYSTEMS LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Summons; Filed by ERA FRANCHISE SYSTEMS LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by ERA FRANCHISE SYSTEMS LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • First Amended Complaint (SUMMONS ISSUED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Summons Filed (ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LBH NATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ERA Franchise Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUDIN AARON PAUL