Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2019 at 17:07:15 (UTC).

EPPS & COULSON LLP VS OLANREWAJU IDEWU ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/17/2014 EPPS COULSON LLP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLANREWAJU IDEWU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL P. LINFIELD and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4074

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

EPPS & COULSON LLP

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

FIT4LA LLC

IDEWU OLANREWAJU

LUXFITSPA LLC

STAFFORD CYNTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY A. COHEN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HOLMES ANDREW B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

11/17/2014: SUMMONS

DECLARATION RE ATTEMPTS AT SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/23/2014: DECLARATION RE ATTEMPTS AT SERVICE OF PROCESS

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

4/21/2015: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

9/1/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/1/2015: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A. COHEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/1/2015: DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A. COHEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICE (CODE CIV. PROC., SEC. 170.6)

10/27/2015: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICE (CODE CIV. PROC., SEC. 170.6)

Unknown

1/13/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

1/20/2016: Minute Order

STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY 0F CYNTHIA STAFFORD

5/5/2016: STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY 0F CYNTHIA STAFFORD

STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY OF CYNTHIA STAFFORD

6/17/2016: STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY OF CYNTHIA STAFFORD

Minute Order

6/21/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/14/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

3/27/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

4/21/2017: Minute Order

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

4/24/2017: STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (APPLICATION TO ENTER DEFAULT)

5/9/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (APPLICATION TO ENTER DEFAULT)

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

6/21/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Cost Bill After Judgment; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Epps & Coulson, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Epps & Coulson, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • Declaration; Filed by Epps & Coulson, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • DECLARATION RE ATTEMPTS AT SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by Epps & Coulson, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC564074    Hearing Date: October 13, 2020    Dept: 34

SUBJECT: Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

Moving Party: Plaintiff Epps & Coulson LLP

Resp. Party: None

The application for order for appearance and examination is GRANTED.

BACKGROUND:

On April 24, 2017, the Court entered a money judgment against Olanrewaju Idewu, and in favor of Plaintiff Epps & Coulson LLP, in the amount of $125,000.00.

On May 15, 2017, default judgment was entered in favor of Plaintiff Epps & Coulson LLP and against Defendants Cynthia Stafford, Fit4LA LLC, and Luxfitspa, LLC, in the amount of $231,260.66.

On August 18, 2020, Plaintiff filed a writ of execution, naming Olanrewaju Idewu as the judgment debtor.

On September 1, 2020, Plaintiff filed the instant application for order for appearance and examination.

On September 23, 2020, Plaintiff filed a proof of personal service of the application for order for appearance and examination as to Olanrewaju Idewu.

ANALYSIS:

I. Legal Standard

Code of Civil Procedure section 708.110, subdivision (a) provides:

“The judgment creditor may apply to the proper court for an order requiring the judgment debtor to appear before the court, or before a referee appointed by the court, at a time and place specified in the order, to furnish information to aid in enforcement of the money judgment.”

Code of Civil Procedure section 708.110, subdivision (d) states:

“The judgment creditor shall personally serve a copy of the order on the judgment debtor not less than 10 days before the date set for the examination. Service shall be made in the manner specified in Section 415.10. Service of the order creates a lien on the personal property of the judgment debtor for a period of one year from the date of the order unless extended or sooner terminated by the court.”

II. Discussion

The Court finds that Defendant Olanrewaju Idewu was properly served with an order for appearance and examination. (Code Civ. Proc., § 708.110 subd. (d).)

The Court GRANTS Plaintiff’s application for order for appearance and examination.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EPPS & COULSON LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLMES ANDREW B.