This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2021 at 01:20:21 (UTC).

ENVIROMONITORING SERVICES INC VS MICHAEL E WOOD

Case Summary

On 09/11/2013 ENVIROMONITORING SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL E WOOD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1129

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ENVIROMONITORING SERVICES INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

WALT'S TOW SERVICE

WOOD MICHAEL E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BERGER * HARRISON APC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

9/11/2013: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS -

9/11/2013: SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

9/12/2013: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/27/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

10/31/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

12/9/2013: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Enviromonitoring Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Enviromonitoring Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Enviromonitoring Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALT'S TOW SERVICE is a litigant