This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 13:44:49 (UTC).

ENRIQUE PENA JR ET AL VS GEMMA BELDEROL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2016 ENRIQUE PENA JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEMMA BELDEROL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3365

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

CARTAGENA CHRISTIAN PHILIP

PENA ENRIQUE. JR

Defendants and Respondents

BELDEROL GEMMA

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ELLIS LAW CORPORATION

Defendant Attorney

HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

 

Court Documents

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [ AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES ] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

1/16/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [ AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES ] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC {AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

4/2/2018: ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC {AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

Opposition

12/20/2018: Opposition

Reply

12/27/2018: Reply

Minute Order

1/4/2019: Minute Order

Brief

1/15/2019: Brief

Notice

1/18/2019: Notice

Unknown

2/8/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

2/8/2019: Minute Order

Notice

2/22/2019: Notice

Minute Order

2/27/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

9/8/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

9/8/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

11/3/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/20/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/13/2017: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

5/1/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Unknown

10/4/2017: Unknown

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Selection of Arbitrator) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Selection of Arbitrator;) of 02/27/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Selection of Arbitrator;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Notice (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE REGARDING SELECTION OF ARBITRATION); Filed by Christian Philip Cartagena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Notice (Selection of Arbitrator); Filed by Gemma Belderol (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Selection of Arbitrator) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Selection of Arbitrator) of 02/08/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Selection of Arbitrator)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2017
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Gemma Belderol (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Gemma Belderol (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Gemma Belderol (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Enrique., Jr Pena (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Enrique., Jr Pena (Legacy Party); Christian Philip Cartagena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Christian Philip Cartagena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC633365    Hearing Date: March 02, 2020    Dept: 29

Pena et al v. Belderol

Plaintiff’s Motion to Select an Arbitrator Pursuant to Cal Code Civil Procedure § 1281.6 is GRANTED.

The Court’s file reflects that on 1/4/19, the Court granted Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Arbitration. The parties were each ordered to submit a list of five arbitrators to the Court from which the Court would choose a panel five arbitrators. The parties were then directed to select an arbitrator from the Court’s panel of five.

On 8/21/19, the Court issued an order naming its panel of arbitrators:

Hon. Robert Jameson

Hon. David Velazquez

Hon. Suzanne Bruguera

Hon. Robert M. Letteau

Mr. Richard Peterson.

The parties were ordered to file their notice of their selected arbitrator by 9/6/19. The parties have not been able to agree on an arbitrator. Accordingly, the Court makes the selection. Cal Code Civ Proc § 1281.6.

The Court selects Hon. David Velazquez as the arbitrator and Hon. Suzanne Bruguera as the alternative arbitrator.

The Order to Show Cause Re:  Completion of Arbitration set for 03/05/2020 is advanced and CONTINUED to 06/09/2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 29.

If request for dismissal if not filed, a Joint report Re:  Status of Arbitration to be filed 5-days prior to 06/09/2020.

The Moving Party is ordered to give notice.