This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 07:21:13 (UTC).

ENICE JONES VS GLEN PARK AT VALLEY VILLAGE ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/30/2015 ENICE JONES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GLEN PARK AT VALLEY VILLAGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART and MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2466

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JONES ENICE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

GLEN PARK AT VALLEY VILLAGE

GLEN PARK RETIREMENT COMMUNITY INC.

LNU ALBA

PINK TILLMAN

WILLIAMS LUDMILA

GLEN PARK

WILLIAMS LUDMILA AN INDIVIDUAL

PINK MIRIAM AN INDIVIDUAL

GLEN PARK RETIREMENT COMMUNITY. INC.

TILLMAN PINK AN INDIVIDUAL

GLEN PARK AT GLENDALE

TILLMAN PINK AN

LOPEZ ALBA

PINK MIRIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

STEIGER LOWELL (LAW OFFICES OF)

LAW OFFICE OF LOWELL STEIGER

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

11/30/2015: PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

SUMMONS

11/30/2015: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/10/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/10/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/10/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/11/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/11/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/11/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/21/2015: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/21/2015: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

STIPULATION TO TRANSFER PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

1/6/2016: STIPULATION TO TRANSFER PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

Minute Order

1/13/2016: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' AMENDED NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND AMENDED DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

1/19/2016: DEFENDANTS' AMENDED NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND AMENDED DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS' AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND AMENDED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

1/19/2016: DEFENDANTS' AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND AMENDED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S, MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

1/19/2016: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S, MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

1/19/2016: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

CIVIL DEPOSIT

1/21/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Enice Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Post-Arbitration Status Conference (Post-Arbitration Status Conference; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Enice Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Enice Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 92; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Glen Park at Valley Village (Defendant); Glen Park Retirement Community. Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Petition - Other; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: GLEN PARK AT VALLEY VILLAGE; PERSON SERVED: TILLMAN PINL Jr.; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: MIRIAM PINK; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Enice Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.