This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 00:18:04 (UTC).

ENDALE MEKURIA ET AL VS JUAN NMN HERNANDEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/13/2016 ENDALE MEKURIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUAN NMN HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK and SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3398

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

TESEMA LULIT A.

MEKURIA ENDALE

IBEX ETHIOPIAN RESTAURANT

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 40

JK DISTRIBUTORS INC

CITY OF INGLEWOOD

HERNANDEZ JUAN NMN

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Defendant

CITY OF INGLEWOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GEBRIEL GIRMA H.

Defendant Attorneys

RUWE W. EDWIN

MALLORY GEORGE L. JR. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DUE DILIGENCE

8/22/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DUE DILIGENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

8/23/2018: Minute Order

MOTION OF DEFENDANT CITY OF INGLEWOOD FOR ORDER STRIKING PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF; ETC

9/27/2018: MOTION OF DEFENDANT CITY OF INGLEWOOD FOR ORDER STRIKING PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF; ETC

Notice

10/19/2018: Notice

Answer

10/26/2018: Answer

Minute Order

11/1/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

3/15/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/15/2019: Declaration

Opposition

3/15/2019: Opposition

Opposition

3/15/2019: Opposition

Minute Order

3/28/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

4/8/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

4/8/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/9/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

12/13/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/13/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 04/08/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of 03/28/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike); Filed by City of Inglewood (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Affidavit (of Reasonable Due Diligence); Filed by Endale Mekuria (Plaintiff); Lulit A. Tesema (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Endale Mekuria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Endale Mekuria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-05-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Endale Mekuria (Plaintiff); Lulit A. Tesema (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC643398    Hearing Date: December 10, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the Southwest District, Torrance, JUDGE Deirdre Hill presiding in Department B for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.