Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 00:45:14 (UTC).

ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA LLC VS SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC

Case Summary

On 01/20/2016 ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7695

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ENCOMPAS DIGITAL MEDIA LLC

Defendant and Respondent

SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HO VALERIE W. ESQ.

ELOWE WAYNE H.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CONKLE JOHN A. ESQ.

KLINE MATTHEW T.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

1/20/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

2/4/2016: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF RICHARD J. VALLADARES; ETC

4/1/2016: PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF RICHARD J. VALLADARES; ETC

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ENCOMPAS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF D. BARRETT BROUSSARD

4/20/2016: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ENCOMPAS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF D. BARRETT BROUSSARD

DEFENDANT AND CROSS- COMPLAINANT SONIFI SOLUTIONS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST, SECOND AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION IN CROSS-C

5/19/2016: DEFENDANT AND CROSS- COMPLAINANT SONIFI SOLUTIONS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST, SECOND AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION IN CROSS-C

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/25/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

ORDER PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT 2.550 AND 2.551 GRANTING PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SEAL EXHIBITS A-D TO THE DECLARATION OF VALERI

6/27/2016: ORDER PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT 2.550 AND 2.551 GRANTING PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SEAL EXHIBITS A-D TO THE DECLARATION OF VALERI

ORDER RE STIPULATIN FOR LEAVE FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSSCOMPLAINT

8/16/2016: ORDER RE STIPULATIN FOR LEAVE FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSSCOMPLAINT

AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/16/2016: AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

8/16/2016: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF JOHN A. CONKLE; STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO THE FILING OF THE FIRST AMENDED CROSSCOMPLAINT

8/16/2016: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF JOHN A. CONKLE; STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO THE FILING OF THE FIRST AMENDED CROSSCOMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF JANNA S. NUGENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JANNA S. NUGENT

8/26/2016: DECLARATION OF JANNA S. NUGENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JANNA S. NUGENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/24/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

2/10/2017: PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DECLARATION OF RICHARD WELCH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT SONIFI SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/10/2017: DECLARATION OF RICHARD WELCH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT SONIFI SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION

2/16/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION

DECLARATION OF ANN M. BYRD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND CROSS DEFENDANT ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ANN M. BYRD

2/22/2017: DECLARATION OF ANN M. BYRD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND CROSS DEFENDANT ENCOMPASS DIGITAL MEDIA, LLC'S MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ANN M. BYRD

Minute Order

3/7/2017: Minute Order

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • at 08:29 AM in Department 52; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Sonifi Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Sonifi Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Request; Filed by Sonifi Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Encompas Digital Media, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
195 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2016
  • at 2:00 PM in Department 12; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Encompas Digital Media, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Encompas Digital Media, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant