This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 23:24:48 (UTC).

ELVIRA VILLANUEVA VS MEB FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP #2

Case Summary

On 09/10/2015 ELVIRA VILLANUEVA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MEB FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP 2. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN F. GASDIA, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and LORI ANN FOURNIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4242

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN F. GASDIA

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

LORI ANN FOURNIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLANUEVA ELVIRA

Claimant

COURTCALL LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

MEB FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP #2

DOES 1-10

MEB FAMILY LIMITD PARTNERSHIP #2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ISAAC TOVEG

TOVEG ISAAC

Defendant Attorneys

MORIARTY KATHLEEN MARGARET

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

ANDERSON KENNETH GEORGE

VAUGHN DARTH K.

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER HEARING OF 10/30/19

10/30/2019: Order - ORDER HEARING OF 10/30/19

Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO UNDATED DECLARATION OF ELVIRA VILLANUEVA

11/27/2019: Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO UNDATED DECLARATION OF ELVIRA VILLANUEVA

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Perso

5/17/2017: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Perso

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Response

8/8/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Response

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ex-Parte Application

8/10/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ex-Parte Application

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Response

8/17/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Response

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

9/13/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel

12/29/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

5/10/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/10/2016: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEFENDANT MEB FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP #2'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

9/16/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEFENDANT MEB FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP #2'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF ELVIRA VILLANUEVA TO RESPOND TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION PROPOUNDED BY DEFENDANT MEB FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP #2, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOU

5/1/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF ELVIRA VILLANUEVA TO RESPOND TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION PROPOUNDED BY DEFENDANT MEB FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP #2, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOU

AMENDED DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY ISAAC TOVEG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MEB MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR MONETATRY SANCTIONS.

6/2/2017: AMENDED DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY ISAAC TOVEG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MEB MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR MONETATRY SANCTIONS.

PLAINTIFF ELVIRA VILLANUEVA RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MEB FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FORM INTERROGATOR1ES

6/2/2017: PLAINTIFF ELVIRA VILLANUEVA RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MEB FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FORM INTERROGATOR1ES

PLAINTIFF ELVIRA VILLANUEVA RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NUMBER ONE

6/2/2017: PLAINTIFF ELVIRA VILLANUEVA RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NUMBER ONE

PLAINTIFF ELVIRA VILLANUEVA RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MEB MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $720.00

6/2/2017: PLAINTIFF ELVIRA VILLANUEVA RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MEB MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $720.00

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS ANB AUTHORITIES; ETC

9/20/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS ANB AUTHORITIES; ETC

ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

9/26/2017: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

163 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department R, Brian F. Gasdia, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department R, Brian F. Gasdia, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Defendant MEB Family Limited Partnership #2's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment of Dismissal); Filed by MEB FAMILY LIMITD PARTNERSHIP #2 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketObjection (Evidentiary Objections to Undated Declaration of Elvira Villanueva); Filed by MEB FAMILY LIMITD PARTNERSHIP #2 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketObjection (Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Elvira Villanueva Part 2); Filed by MEB FAMILY LIMITD PARTNERSHIP #2 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Isaac Toveg (Attorney); Law Offices of Isaac Toveg (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department C; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
371 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by ELVIRA VILLANUEVA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees (ELVIRA VILLANUEVA ); Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver; Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued ( FEE WAIVER -$435.00 9/10/15); Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ELVIRA VILLANUEVA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC594242    Hearing Date: October 30, 2019    Dept: SEC

VILLANUEVA v. MEB FAMILY PARTNERSHIP #2

CASE NO.: BC594242

HEARING: 10/30/19

JUDGE: MARGARET M. BERNAL

#13

TENTATIVE ORDER

ISAAC TOVEG’s unopposed motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Plaintiff ELVIRA VILLANUEVA is GRANTED. (C.R.C. 3.1362.)

Moving Party to give Notice.

No Opposition filed as of October 25, 2019.

The Court finds that Counsel has met the procedural requirements, including proper notice to the client at the last known residence or business address of the client. C.R.C. 3.1362.

Here, Counsel’s declaration indicates that “[t]here is a conflict of interest.” Where the issue (or conflict) is between the lawyer and client, without implicating other parties, the court can rely on counsel’s sworn declaration absent any reason to doubt the representations.

There is a Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal set for December 12, 2019 at 1;30 p.m. in Dept. SE-C. Notwithstanding, no Opposition has been filed as of October 25, 2019, and there is an undisputed breakdown in attorney-client communications. It does not appear that Attorney Toveg’s continued representation would serve the interests of justice. The parties may seek a continuance of the Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default in Dept SE-C, if necessary. Counsel’s motion to withdraw is granted.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEB FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP #1 A is a litigant

Latest cases where COURTCALL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAUGHN DARTH KADEI

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORIARTY KATHLEEN MARGARET