This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2015 at 23:10:00 (UTC).

ELLSA RAMCLAM VS WARNER HORIZON TELEVISION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 ELLSA RAMCLAM filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WARNER HORIZON TELEVISION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LEE SMALLEY EDMON, TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON and CONRAD R. ARAGON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6830

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LEE SMALLEY EDMON

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

CONRAD R. ARAGON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMCLAM ELLSA

Defendants

DAFT PRODUCTIONS INC.

DOES 1 - 100

MCFADDEN LARRY

WARNER HORIZON TELEVISION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GERBER KARL ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BALLARD ROSENBERG GOLPER & SAVITT LLP

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

10/6/2008: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS

8/22/2008: SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

11/13/2008: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT WARNER HORIZON TELEVISIONS MOITON TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PLAINTIFFS PERSONAL DIARY

1/23/2009: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT WARNER HORIZON TELEVISIONS MOITON TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PLAINTIFFS PERSONAL DIARY

Minute Order

12/1/2008: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PLAINTIFFS PERSONAL DIARY

1/15/2009: DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PLAINTIFFS PERSONAL DIARY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/27/2009: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

4/23/2009: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/21/2008: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

5/5/2009: Minute Order

NOTICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (C.C.P. SECTION 170.6)

10/7/2008: NOTICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (C.C.P. SECTION 170.6)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

11/18/2008: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DEFENDANT WARNER HORIZON TELEVISIONS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PLAINTIFFS PERSONAL DIARY, ETC.

1/15/2009: DEFENDANT WARNER HORIZON TELEVISIONS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PLAINTIFFS PERSONAL DIARY, ETC.

Minute Order

10/20/2008: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BASED UPON: 1. VIOLATION OF FEHA AND CALIFORNIA CONSTITUTION; ETC.

8/22/2008: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BASED UPON: 1. VIOLATION OF FEHA AND CALIFORNIA CONSTITUTION; ETC.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2009
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (w/p entire action of all.. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • Notice Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • Statement of Case (DEFT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PLNTF'S PERSONAL DIARY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • Motion to Compel (PRODUCTION OF PLNTF'S PERSONAL DIARY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,750 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2008
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2008
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.