This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:49:05 (UTC).

ELIZABETH SERVIN MORENO VS ADAM NATHANIEL MAMELAK M D ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/09/2016 ELIZABETH SERVIN MORENO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ADAM NATHANIEL MAMELAK M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9767

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MORENO ELIZABETH SERVIN

SERVIN GUADALUPE

Defendants and Respondents

MAMELAK ADAM NATHANIEL M.D.

DOES 1-175

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem

SERVIN GUADALUPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARSHALL SILBERBERG

Defendant Attorney

WEISS DAVID JAY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS, CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND ADAM MAMELAK, M.D.'S STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES;

2/16/2018: DEFENDANTS, CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND ADAM MAMELAK, M.D.'S STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES;

Minute Order

2/16/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF JAZMIN MENDEZ

7/31/2018: DECLARATION OF JAZMIN MENDEZ

ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

7/31/2018: ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

DEFENDANTS, CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND ADAM MAMELAK, M.D.'S STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES;

7/31/2018: DEFENDANTS, CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND ADAM MAMELAK, M.D.'S STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES;

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

2/27/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

3/1/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

3/6/2019: Notice of Ruling

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

5/9/2016: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/9/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

5/13/2016: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

DECLARATION OF DAVID D. NEER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION ETC.

8/8/2016: DECLARATION OF DAVID D. NEER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION ETC.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ETC.

8/8/2016: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ETC.

SUMMONS

8/16/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

9/21/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND ADAM MAMELAK, M.D.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/11/2016: DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND ADAM MAMELAK, M.D.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

10/11/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

[ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

9/1/2017: [ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Adam Nathaniel Mamelak, M.D. (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an order continuing trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order continuing trial;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (DEFENDANTS, CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND ADAM MAMELAK, M.D.'S STIPULATED EX PARTS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES; DECLARATION OF PAMELA A. OWEN, ESQ.); Filed by Adam Nathaniel Mamelak, M.D. (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Adam Nathaniel Mamelak, M.D. (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DAVID D. NEER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Elizabeth Servin Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC619767    Hearing Date: February 26, 2020    Dept: 29

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Guadalupe Servin (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Elizabeth Moreno (“Claimant”). The Court also made inquiries of Petitioner during the hearing. Based upon the foregoing, the Court approves the settlement in this case by signing the proposed order on Form MC-351. The Court incorporates the following findings and orders into Form MC-351:

1. The settlement is fair and reasonable.

2. The award of attorneys’ fees is appropriate.

3. The Court intends to approve distribution of the settlement as follows:

Attorney’s Fees (30%): $74,166.00

Medical Expenses: 0.00

Costs: 0.00

Total Fees and Costs $74,166.00

Total Settlement $250,000.00

Less Credits - $74,166.00

Net Settlement $175,834.00

4. The Court approves the establishment of the “Elizabeth S. Moreno Irrevocable Special Needs Trust” (hereinafter, the “Special Needs Trust”). Petitioner is authorized to execute the trust.

5. Petitioner is ordered to file a proposed order approving the SNT, which includes the following:

a. The provisions of the trust in their entirety [LASC Local Rule 4.115(d)(2)].

b. The findings required by Probate Code 3604(b)(1-3) (included in Attachment 21 of the petition).

c. The provision for satisfaction of statutory liens per Probate Code 3604(d).

d. An order the trustee commence a separate trust proceeding (included in Attachment 21 of the petition).

e. The amount of the trustee’s bond (included in Attachment 21 of the petition), which is $194,000.

f. The due date for the first accounting (one year from trust establishment, i.e., 02/26/2021).

g. The requested investment powers, which the Court allows.

h. The proposed periodic trustee payments for no longer than 12 months.

The trustee is ordered to file Notice of Commencement of Proceeding for a Court Supervised Trust, attaching a conformed copy of the order and the bond.  The Court sets a status conference for April 28, 2020 at 8:30 for proof of filing the Notice.

Case Number: BC619767    Hearing Date: January 15, 2020    Dept: 29

Moreno v. Mamelak MD et al.

SUBJECT TO HEARING AND PERSONAL APPEARANCE THEREON:

The parties having appeared (CRC 7.952(a)), and the court having reviewed and heard the Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim of a Person With a Disability (Elizabeth Moreno, Age 37), the court finds that the settlement is reasonable.

The court intends to approve distribution of the settlement as follows:

Attorney’s fees (30%)

$74,166.00

Medical expenses

0.00

Costs

0.00

Total fees and costs

$74,166.00

Total Settlement

$250,000.00

Less credits

-74,166.00

Net Settlement

$175,834.00

Petitioner proposes to transfer the settlement funds into a special needs trust for the benefit of the claimant. Petition, Attachment 19b(4). The Probate Department must review the terms of the trust. LA. County Super. Ct. R 2.7(f) and 4.115(c). 

The hearing is continued to 2/26/20 at 1:30 p.m. in Department SS-2 to permit the Probate Department’s review.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.