This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 23:30:30 (UTC).

ELIZABETH LIEU VS BABAK RAZI, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 02/19/2015 ELIZABETH LIEU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BABAK RAZI, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3805

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

QUALITY DRYWALL & METAL STUDS INC.

LIEU ELIZABETH

Defendants

CG SEVENTH STREET LLC

COMERICA BANK

DRIVER URBAN LLC

BEAUDRY-BEVERLY HILLS. LP

GLOBAL TINKER

MORRISON CHRISTOPHER

MORRISON MINK

TWISTORY STUDIOS LLC

RAZI BABAK

TWISTORY LLC

TINKER GLOBAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HORWITZ MARTIN L.

Defendant Attorneys

AFIFI FARYAN ANDREW

SALVATORE MICHAEL J.

SHAPERO & SHAPERO

WEINBERG STEVEN M.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/7/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/1/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/15/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/25/2017: Minute Order

Jury Instructions

9/8/2017: Jury Instructions

Minute Order

2/16/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

3/12/2019: Declaration

Notice of Ruling

6/30/2015: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

4/29/2016: Notice of Ruling

Exhibit List

5/24/2018: Exhibit List

Case Management Statement

11/17/2015: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document

4/21/2015: Legacy Document

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/19/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

2/19/2015: Summons

Legacy Document

4/17/2015: Legacy Document

Minute Order

3/25/2019: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/16/2015: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Ruling

6/21/2016: Notice of Ruling

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Elizabeth Lieu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Elizabeth Lieu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion in Limine ((competing motions in limine)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion in Limine (competing motions in limine))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Declaration (Horwitz Declaration Regarding Defendant's Filing Of a Supplemental Motion In Limine Brief); Filed by Elizabeth Lieu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • STIPULATED FACTS PERTINENT TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE; Filed by Christopher Morrison (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Motion in Limine (Morrison's Undisputed Facts for Purposes of MIL); Filed by Christopher Morrison (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Notice (NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING); Filed by Elizabeth Lieu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
188 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Elizabeth Lieu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Elizabeth Lieu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Elizabeth Lieu (Plaintiff); Twistory Studios, LLC (Legacy Party); Twistory, LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Elizabeth Lieu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Quality Drywall & Metal Studs, Inc. (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Lieu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.