This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 04:34:41 (UTC).

ELIZABETH CASTILLO ET AL VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 ELIZABETH CASTILLO filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EMILIE H. ELIAS and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4353

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EMILIE H. ELIAS

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Respondents

CASTILLO RENE

CASTILLO ELIZABETH

BONGIORNO ROSANNA

WEISS DEBRA

TURILLI ROBERT

HARDER JOY

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

SEMPRA ENERGY

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem

CASTILLO ELIZABETH

Minors

CASTILLO MARCO

CASTILLO VIANCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

BOLTON DEVIN LYNN

WEITZ & LUXENBERG P.C. A NY PROF. CORP.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LATHAM & WATKINS LLP

 

Court Documents

Civil Deposit

10/25/2016: Civil Deposit

Civil Deposit

10/25/2016: Civil Deposit

COMPLAINT 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

12/16/2015: COMPLAINT 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Debra Weiss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • at 2:15 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 10:30 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • at 2:45 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Initial Status Conference 5 new cases; Hea...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Rosanna Bongiorno (Plaintiff); Leonardio Bongiorno (Plaintiff); Joy Harder (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Civil Deposit CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Civil Deposit CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • at 4:00 PM in Department 324; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-12-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Sempra Energy (Defendant); Southern California Gas Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Southern California Gas Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Elizabeth Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • COMPLAINT 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less