This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:48:26 (UTC).

ELIZA T AKOPYAN ET AL VS CITY OF GLENDALE ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/09/2015 ELIZA T AKOPYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF GLENDALE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8349

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AKOPYAN ELIZA T.

AKOPYAN SAAK

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

GLENDALE CITY OF

GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT

L.A. CITY OF

L.A. COUNTY OF

ROSAS DAVID OFFICER

DEPARTMENT GLENDALE POLICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MGDESYAN GEORGE G. ESQ.

MGDESYAN LAW FIRM

FIRM MGDESYAN LAW

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

RAWCLIFFE ANDREW C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/9/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/9/2015: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/9/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/17/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/18/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/21/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/22/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/5/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANTS CITY OF GLENDALE, GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT, AND DAVID ROSAS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/7/2015: DEFENDANTS CITY OF GLENDALE, GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT, AND DAVID ROSAS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/8/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA FOR BUSINESS RECORDS OR ORDER COMMANDING PLAINTIFF TO EXECUTE A RELEASE; DECLARATION OF ANDREW C. RAWCLIFFE

6/2/2016: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA FOR BUSINESS RECORDS OR ORDER COMMANDING PLAINTIFF TO EXECUTE A RELEASE; DECLARATION OF ANDREW C. RAWCLIFFE

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

6/14/2016: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

Minute Order

6/29/2016: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/17/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

[ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

9/1/2016: [ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL/FSC

9/9/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL/FSC

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

12/14/2016: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

CIVIL DEPOSIT

1/26/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Eliza T. Akopyan (Plaintiff); Saak Akopyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Eliza T. Akopyan (Plaintiff); Saak Akopyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Eliza T. Akopyan (Plaintiff); Saak Akopyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Eliza T. Akopyan (Plaintiff); Saak Akopyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Eliza T. Akopyan (Plaintiff); Saak Akopyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT GLENDALE POLICE is a litigant

Latest cases where Glendale Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where LA CITY CAB LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE CITY OF is a litigant