Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 00:09:27 (UTC).

ELISHA SAMEYAH VS JULIA STUART HODGE

Case Summary

On 10/27/2016 ELISHA SAMEYAH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JULIA STUART HODGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8518

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SAMEYAH ELISHA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

HODGE JULIA STUART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PAYA BRIAN ESQ.

PAYA BAHRAM BRIAN

PAYA BRIAN

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH HILARY W.

SMITH HILARY WALLINGTON

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO THE DEMURRER TO THE ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/11/2018: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO THE DEMURRER TO THE ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

7/2/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

10/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/22/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

3/22/2019: Stipulation and Order

SUMMONS

10/27/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/27/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES, ETC

4/3/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES, ETC

Minute Order

5/18/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/30/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIIKE PUNITIVE AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/26/2017: OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIIKE PUNITIVE AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES

8/3/2017: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

9/8/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIIKE PUNITIVE AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/7/2017: OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIIKE PUNITIVE AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/16/2017: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

12/8/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/8/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMURRER TO ANSWER; AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN SUPPORT THEREOF

12/13/2017: DEMURRER TO ANSWER; AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN SUPPORT THEREOF

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order re Mandatory Settlement Conference:)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (re Statement of Policies and Procedures for MSC;acknowldgment of receipt & stipulation); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by ELISHA SAMEYAH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2017
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by ELISHA SAMEYAH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Opposition; Filed by Witness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Opposition (NON-PARTY WITNESS-OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MTN TO COMPEL; MEMO OF P&A DECLARATION OF CHUNG H CHO; DECLARATION OF SONIA CERVANTES; FILED BY: CHUNG CHO DEPUTY CITY AT); Filed by Witness

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH HILARY W