This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2021 at 20:49:57 (UTC).

ELIA TIBURCIO VALERIANO ET AL VS YERGLER CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 ELIA TIBURCIO VALERIANO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YERGLER CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM, HOLLY J. FUJIE, LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7987

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

HOLLY J. FUJIE

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem

VALERIANO ELIA TIBURCIO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

VASQUEZ JULIO CESAR VASQUEZ JR.

YERGLER CORPORATION

VASQUEZ JULIO CESAR JR.

Minor

HERNANDEZ ZARAI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor and Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS R. FUSI &

LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS R. FUSI

FUSI DENNIS RALPH

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MONTELEONE ANA J. ESQ.

FLORES ZOJEILA ITZEL ESQ.

FLORES ZOJEILA I. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

1/10/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILTY OF COUNSEL

9/6/2018: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILTY OF COUNSEL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 04/11/2019

4/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 04/11/2019

Notice of Change of Firm Name

7/31/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

9/20/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

10/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/13/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

3/19/2014: GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

11/17/2014: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER SEEKING LEAVE OF THE COURTTO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT; ETC

4/8/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER SEEKING LEAVE OF THE COURTTO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT; ETC

NOTICE OF RULING FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/9/2015: NOTICE OF RULING FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/9/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF FILING OF BANKRUPTCY

12/8/2015: NOTICE OF FILING OF BANKRUPTCY

Minute Order -

1/19/2016: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING AT FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/26/2016: NOTICE OF RULING AT FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

2/17/2017: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF DENNIS R. FUSI SUBMITTED IN CONNECTION WITH THE COURT'S "ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE" HEARING.

6/12/2017: DECLARATION OF DENNIS R. FUSI SUBMITTED IN CONNECTION WITH THE COURT'S "ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE" HEARING.

Minute Order -

6/16/2017: Minute Order -

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit of Funds into Blocked Account) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit of Funds into Blocked Minors Account) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit of Funds into Blocked Account) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Elia Tiburcio Valeriano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit of Funds into Blocked Minors Account) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit of Funds into Blocke...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Elia Tiburcio Valeriano (Plaintiff); Zarai Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2014
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Yergler Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Yergler Corporation (Defendant); Julio Cesar Vasquez, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND.DRDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARFLFAN AD LITEMCML EXPARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Elia Tiburcio Valeriano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC517987    Hearing Date: October 25, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITIONS TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Claimant Zarai Hernandez (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through her parent Elia Tiburcio Valeriano (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle her claims against Defendants Julio Vasquez and Yergler Corporation in exchange for $725,000.00. If approved, $92,674.63 will be used to pay medical expenses, $239,250.00 will be used to pay attorneys fees, and $1,045.13 will be used to pay non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $392,030.24 for Claimant, to be deposited into two blocked accounts.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code of Civ. Proc. § 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds it to be fair and reasonable. Further, the Court finds the proposed attorney’s fees, which amount to 32% of the settlement amount, to be fair and reasonable.

Accordingly, the unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

The Court sets an OSC for December 6, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. for proof of deposit. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 7.953(a).) If an acknowledgement of receipt by the financial institution is filed before that date, no appearance will be required.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the October 25, 2019 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimant’s appearance is not necessary, but will require Petitioner to appear.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.