This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 17:59:00 (UTC).

ELEANOR YOUNG ET AL VS AMERICANA INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC ET

Case Summary

On 06/17/2016 ELEANOR YOUNG filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against AMERICANA INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4299

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BELL HERMAN

YOUNG ELEANOR

Defendants and Respondents

AMERICANA INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

MORGAN DAVID L.

PLEASANT CASAUDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DUNN BRIAN T. ESQ.

DUNN BRIAN THOMAS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

1/4/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

1/4/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/13/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

LAW AND MOTION RULINGS

2/26/2018: LAW AND MOTION RULINGS

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND RENEWED MOTION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE AMERICANA INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC. VIA THE SECRETARY OF STATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DECLARE AND ADJUDGE S

6/8/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND RENEWED MOTION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE AMERICANA INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC. VIA THE SECRETARY OF STATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DECLARE AND ADJUDGE S

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/25/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Ruling

9/25/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

9/27/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Ex Parte Application

5/2/2019: Ex Parte Application

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/24/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF MAILING

8/24/2016: DECLARATION OF MAILING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/30/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

11/2/2016: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/1/2017: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/11/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Eleanor Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (To File Amended Complaint) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 4:39 PM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Amended Complaint (2nd); Filed by Eleanor Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Verified Second Amended Complaint for Damages; Filed by Herman Bell (Plaintiff); Eleanor Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AND SERVE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2016
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Eleanor Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Herman Bell (Plaintiff); Eleanor Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE 2. FRAUD; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC624299    Hearing Date: April 30, 2021    Dept: 19

 Plaintiff Eleanor Young's Motions to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Request for Production (Set One), Form Interrogatories (Set One), Request for Admissions (Set One) and Special Interrogatories (Set One) ) are rejected and not considered by the Court.The Court's April 7, 2021 Order shortening time for these hearings required Plaintiff to file and serve all of the motions by no later than April 14, 2021.   Plaintiff's motions were not filed until April 16, 2021, and are therefore untimely according to the shortened briefing schedule set by the Court.  Leave to file the motions on a later date was not given. The Court also notes that on April 7, 2021, the Court denied Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted (establish the truth of the matters specified therein).  The motion filed on April 7, 2021 appears to seek the same relief, and is not a motion to compel further responses. Counsel for Plaintiff to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICANA INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNN BRIAN T.