This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 17:57:42 (UTC).

EHSAN YAGHOUBI VS DITECH

Case Summary

On 08/30/2016 EHSAN YAGHOUBI filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DITECH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1916

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YAGHOUBI EHSAN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

DITECH

Intervenor

AAE PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MCCLENDON REGINA J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

8/30/2016: COMPLAINT: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

Unknown

8/30/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ETC.

9/8/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ETC.

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

9/9/2016: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/26/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Ehsan Yaghoubi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 42; (Motion for Leave; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-03-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Ditech (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SUSTAINING DITECH FINANCIAL LLC'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIF'S COMPLA1N WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND STRIKING NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Ditech (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Intervenor

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Ehsan Yaghoubi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • COMPLAINT: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Ehsan Yaghoubi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAE PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DITECH A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLENDON REGINA J