This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2020 at 09:46:22 (UTC).

EFRAIN CRUZ VS. GUEYLIAM B WONG

Case Summary

On 10/19/2012 EFRAIN CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GUEYLIAM B WONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HALM, HOWARD L., GAIL FEUER and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0353

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HALM, HOWARD L.

GAIL FEUER

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRUZ EFRAIN

Defendants

KAO ANDY

WANG JENNY

WONG ANGELA TRS

WONG GUEYLIAM B

ZHONG YONG

GUEYLIAM WONG FAMILY TRUST (SETTLED)

MIKE ZHONG (DOE 1)

GUEYLIAM WONG FAMILY TRUST SETTLED

MIKE ZHONG DOE 1

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINK ROBERT S.

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

1/31/2014: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

JUDGMENT

8/24/2015: JUDGMENT

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/COPY OF FILED DOCUMENT

5/8/2015: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/COPY OF FILED DOCUMENT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

8/27/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

7/25/2014: NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

8/27/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

Minute Order -

9/25/2014: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/22/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

4/18/2013: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/25/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/COPY OF FILED DOCUMENT

7/21/2015: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/COPY OF FILED DOCUMENT

DEFENDANT GUKYLIAM WONG FAMILY TRUST (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS WONG, CUEYLIAM B. AND ANGELA TRS.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/29/2013: DEFENDANT GUKYLIAM WONG FAMILY TRUST (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS WONG, CUEYLIAM B. AND ANGELA TRS.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/22/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/22/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

5/15/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

3/18/2015: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/15/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

3/28/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by EFRAIN CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by EFRAIN CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketJUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketDOCUMENTS IN RE DEFAULT JUDGEMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketJUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by EFRAIN CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by EFRAIN CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketDefault Judgment (AGAINST ANDY KAO ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketDefault Judgment (AGAINST YONG ZHONG ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketDefault Judgment (AGAINST MIKE ZHONG ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2012
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by WONG, GUEYLIAM B (DISMISSED 4/30/14) (Defendant); WONG, ANGELA TRS (DISMISSED 4/30/14) (Defendant); Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by WONG, GUEYLIAM B (DISMISSED 4/30/14) (Defendant); WONG, ANGELA TRS (DISMISSED 4/30/14) (Defendant); Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WONG, GUEYLIAM B (DISMISSED 4/30/14) (Defendant); WONG, ANGELA TRS (DISMISSED 4/30/14) (Defendant); Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by EFRAIN CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by EFRAIN CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by EFRAIN CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by EFRAIN CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EFRAIN CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.