Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:37:43 (UTC).

EDY ARNOLD HERNANDEZ ET AL VS AZMATH QURESHI M D ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/17/2016 EDY ARNOLD HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against AZMATH QURESHI M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0654

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem

HERNANDEZ EDY ARNOLD

Defendants and Respondents

QURESHI AZMATH M.D.

AZMATH QURESHI M.D. INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

MILBOURN KELLY CNM [DOE 2]

AZMATH QURESHI M.D. INC. S/J

THE GRAND APARTMENTS

BOLAJI ELIZABETH RN [DOE 1]S/J

MILBOURN KELLY NP DOE 2

QURESHI AZMATH M.D. S/J

Minors

HERNANDEZ GEORGE

HERNANDEZ ELIAS

Not Classified By Court

HERNANDEZ EDY

SAMPLES ROSA

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

GULDEN & ASSOCIATES INC.

NACIONALES-TAFOYA ROBERT MANUEL ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

WORKMAN SETH ELIJAH ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED AND DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS AZMATH QURESHI, M.D.'S, AZMATH QURESHI, M.D., INC.'S AND ELIZABETH BOLAJI, RN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY

1/16/2018: PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED AND DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS AZMATH QURESHI, M.D.'S, AZMATH QURESHI, M.D., INC.'S AND ELIZABETH BOLAJI, RN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY

PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF KENNETH MCCLAIN, M.D. IN OPPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/16/2018: PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF KENNETH MCCLAIN, M.D. IN OPPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS AZMATH QURESHI, M.D.'S AZMATH QURESHI, M.D., INC.'S AND ELIZABETH BOLAJI, RN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/16/2018: PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS AZMATH QURESHI, M.D.'S AZMATH QURESHI, M.D., INC.'S AND ELIZABETH BOLAJI, RN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AZMATH QURESHI, M.D., AZMATH QURESHI, M.D., INC., AND ELIZABETH BOLAJI, R.N. PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 437C

4/9/2018: JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AZMATH QURESHI, M.D., AZMATH QURESHI, M.D., INC., AND ELIZABETH BOLAJI, R.N. PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 437C

NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS-APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS-APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL)

8/10/2018: NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL)

Minute Order

1/30/2019: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/31/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

MOTION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

10/17/2016: MOTION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

1/23/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

1/23/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT AZMATH QURESHI, M.D.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; ETC

3/3/2017: DEFENDANT AZMATH QURESHI, M.D.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; ETC

Minute Order

4/17/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

4/19/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91,92,93,97)

5/31/2017: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91,92,93,97)

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANTS AZMATH QURESHI M.D. AND AZMATH QURESHI, M.D., INC.

9/8/2017: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANTS AZMATH QURESHI M.D. AND AZMATH QURESHI, M.D., INC.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH BOLAJI, RN

11/15/2017: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH BOLAJI, RN

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Mark Lawrence Hirschberg, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Bolaji, Elizabeth RN [DOE 1](S/J) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure of Plaintiff to Appear on 01/30/2018 and for Failure to Enter Default Judgment Pursuant to California Rules of Court Section 3.110(h)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why This Action Should Not Be Dismiss...) of 03/05/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why This Action Should Not Be Dismiss...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified (3 VOLUMES); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal ((Default Entered 05/18/2018 as to Rem. Doe Deft. 2 - Kelly Milbourn, CNM)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Default Entered 05/18/2018...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
146 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH (MEDICAL MALPRACTICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edy Arnold Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC620654    Hearing Date: April 30, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

EDY ARNOLD HERNANDEZ, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

AZMATH QURESHI, M.D., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC620654

[TENTATIVE] ORDER TAKING PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE OFF-CALENDAR

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

April 30, 2021

 

Plaintiffs, Edy Hernandez, et al. filed this action against Defendants, Azmath Qureshi, M.D., et al. for damages arising out of wrongful death/medical malpractice in connection with the care and treatment of Decedent, Marleny Escobar.

A petition to confirm minor’s compromise with Special Needs Trust was reserved for hearing in this court for 4/30/21. However, as of 4/27/21, no petition has been filed in connection with the hearing. Therefore, the hearing on petition to confirm minor’s compromise is taken off-calendar.

Plaintiffs are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.orgIf the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 30th day of April, 2021

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Grad Apts is a litigant

Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WORKMAN SETH ELIJAH