This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 09:11:31 (UTC).

EDWIN ERFE VS RELIABLE PROPERTIES ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/18/2015 EDWIN ERFE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against RELIABLE PROPERTIES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5868

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ERFE EDWIN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

RELIABLE PROPERTIES

RP PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

APPELL SHAPIRO LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WICKHAM DOUGLAS A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

3/18/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WHLSTLEBLOWER RETALIATION (LABOR CODE SECTION 1102.5); ETC

3/18/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WHLSTLEBLOWER RETALIATION (LABOR CODE SECTION 1102.5); ETC

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT RELIABLE PROPERTIES T0 PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/5/2015: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT RELIABLE PROPERTIES T0 PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT RELIABLE PROPERTIES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

5/14/2015: DEFENDANT RELIABLE PROPERTIES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

DECLARATION OF JACK NOURAFSHAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

5/14/2015: DECLARATION OF JACK NOURAFSHAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

5/14/2015: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY CASE PENDING DECISION ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

5/18/2015: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY CASE PENDING DECISION ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

PLAINTIFF EDWIN ERFE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT RELIABLE PROPERTIES' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS; DECLARATION OF EDWIN ERFE

6/19/2015: PLAINTIFF EDWIN ERFE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT RELIABLE PROPERTIES' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS; DECLARATION OF EDWIN ERFE

DECLARATION OF JACK NOURAFSHAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

6/25/2015: DECLARATION OF JACK NOURAFSHAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

6/25/2015: DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

6/26/2015: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order

7/9/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

7/16/2015: NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order

5/12/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE: OSC RE STATUS OF COMMENCEMENT OF ARBITRATION

6/3/2016: NOTICE OF RULING RE: OSC RE STATUS OF COMMENCEMENT OF ARBITRATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/14/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

12/29/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

12/29/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 15; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Reliable Properties (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Edwin Erfe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: OSC RE STATUS OF COMMENCEMENT OF ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Reliable Properties (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 15; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2015
  • DEFENDANT RELIABLE PROPERTIES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DECLARATION OF JACK NOURAFSHAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • ANSWER OF DEFENDANT RELIABLE PROPERTIES T0 PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Reliable Properties (Defendant); RP Property Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Edwin Erfe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WHLSTLEBLOWER RETALIATION (LABOR CODE SECTION 1102.5); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RP PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where RELIABLE PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WICKHAM DOUGLAS A.