This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2019 at 21:31:20 (UTC).

EDUARDO E RIVAS VS VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2015 EDUARDO E RIVAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT L. HESS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4595

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT L. HESS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RIVAS EDUARDO E

RIVAS EDUARDO E.

Defendants and Respondents

ANDERSON ANITA

DOES 1-5

VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CANNON LEGAL GROUP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ZADRAVECZ STEVEN M. ESQ.

MILLS JASON S.

FITZGERALD BARBARA A. ESQ

QUINN MONICA MARTELLI

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

8/19/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

8/26/2019: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ((1) PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO REMOVE COUNSEL (2) EX PART...) OF 08/27/2019

8/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ((1) PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO REMOVE COUNSEL (2) EX PART...) OF 08/27/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE REMITTITUR)

9/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE REMITTITUR)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/3/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/15/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Substitution of Attorney

5/29/2019: Substitution of Attorney

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/8/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS VERIZON CALIFORNIA, INC. AND ANITA ANDERSON TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2/16/2016: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS VERIZON CALIFORNIA, INC. AND ANITA ANDERSON TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

3/18/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Minute Order -

3/29/2016: Minute Order -

DEFENDANT VERIZON CALIFORNIA, INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES (C.C.P. 631]

3/29/2016: DEFENDANT VERIZON CALIFORNIA, INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES (C.C.P. 631]

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

5/9/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

NOTICE OF HEARING RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR NON-APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/29/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR NON-APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

1/11/2017: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

1/13/2017: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

PROPOSED ORDER

8/14/2017: PROPOSED ORDER

ORDER

8/22/2017: ORDER

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • Hearing09/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Hearing09/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Hearing06/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Hearing12/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketRequest Addendum of Fee Waiver to Include Jury Fees; Filed by Eduardo E. Rivas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Status Conference (re Remittitur) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re Remittitur)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2016-02-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketDEFENDANTS VERIZON CALIFORNIA, INC. AND ANITA ANDERSON'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES [C.C.P. 63 1]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFF EDUARDO E. RIVAS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY (CONSTRUCTIVE DISCHARGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY (CONSTRUCTIVE DISCHARGE); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eduardo E. Rivas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC594595    Hearing Date: December 10, 2019    Dept: 24

Plaintiff Eduardo E. Rivas’s motion to compel initial discovery responses is DENIED.

On September 14, 2019, Plaintiff Eduardo E. Rivas filed the instant wrongful termination action against Defendants Verizon Communications and Anita Anderson. On August 7, 2019, Plaintiff filed a motion to compel production of documents. On November 25, 2019, Defendants filed an opposition.

Legal Standard

Where there has been no timely response to a CCP § 2031.010 demand, the demanding party must seek an order compelling a response. (CCP § 2031.300.) Failure to timely respond waives all objections, including privilege and work product. Thus, unless the party to whom the demand was directed obtains relief from waiver, he or she cannot raise objections to the documents demanded. There is no deadline for a motion to compel responses. Likewise, for failure to respond, the moving party need not attempt to resolve the matter outside court before filing the motion. Where the motion seeks only a response to the inspection demand, no showing of "good cause" is required.

Discussion

To the extent that the motion is not mooted by Defendants’ service of responses, the motion would still be denied. (See Parker Decl., ¶¶ 5-7 [Defendants served timely objections and served verified discovery responses, producing 2500 pages of responsive documents].) Plaintiff only provides a single paragraph notice as his moving papers, with no points and authorities. Plaintiff provides no evidence that he duly served any discovery requests, or that none were received. Thus, the basic facts of the motion are not even established. Even if he were to provide such evidence, any sanctions request was not properly made. Plaintiff requests sanctions, but noticed no particular sanctions. Thus, Defendants were not fairly appraised of the sanctions being sought, and none therefore would be imposed.

Accordingly, Plaintiff’s motion is DENIED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.