This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 02:13:57 (UTC).

EDGAR EDUARDO MAGANA (A MINOR) VS ALFRED JESUS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 11/18/2011 EDGAR EDUARDO MAGANA A MINOR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALFRED JESUS HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DUKES, ROBERT A., OKI, DAN THOMAS, SAMANTHA P. JESSNER and PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2564

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DUKES, ROBERT A.

OKI, DAN THOMAS

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

FALCON BEATRIZ

MAGANA OSCAR

MAGANA OSCAR DAVID

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HERNANDEZ ALFRED JESUS

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

WEST COVINA CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

CITY OF WEST COVINA

Minor

MAGANA EDGAR EDUARDO

Decedent

MAGANA OSCAR DAIVD

Not Classified By Court

GIRARDI JOHN A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

COLVIN ROGER A.

MOORHEAD J. PHILLIP

PRICE JR. LESLIE M. ESQ.

HURELL THOMAS

Minor Attorney

MACKAY SASSAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: SUMMONS ISSUED

11/18/2011: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: SUMMONS ISSUED

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: RTN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPL

1/20/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: RTN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY TO MOTION

3/19/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY TO MOTION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: CROSS-COMPL FLD - SUMMONS ISSUED

5/7/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: CROSS-COMPL FLD - SUMMONS ISSUED

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERICA BIANCO

8/10/2012: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERICA BIANCO

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE, TO PLAINTIFF BEATRIZ FALCON, INDIVIDUALLY

10/11/2012: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE, TO PLAINTIFF BEATRIZ FALCON, INDIVIDUALLY

Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING

10/25/2012: Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

11/5/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DISMISSED - OTHER

11/26/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DISMISSED - OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION POINTS & AUTHORITIES

12/13/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION POINTS & AUTHORITIES

Notice of Ruling

1/7/2013: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/26/2013: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY/RESPONSE

4/12/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY/RESPONSE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2013-07-02 00:00:00

7/2/2013: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2013-07-02 00:00:00

Notice of Entry of Judgment

8/29/2013: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SETTLEMENT PAYMENT BY DEFENDANT, INTEREST ON THE PAYMENT AT 10% PER YEAR, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMO OF POINTS AND A

11/1/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SETTLEMENT PAYMENT BY DEFENDANT, INTEREST ON THE PAYMENT AT 10% PER YEAR, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMO OF POINTS AND A

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PAYMENT ...) OF 11/20/2019

11/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PAYMENT ...) OF 11/20/2019

Minute Order -

5/17/2013: Minute Order -

109 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR ORDER COMPELLING PAYMENT BY DEFENDANT ACCORDING TO TERMS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ENTER JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT RALPH'S IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 30,000.00 PLUS INTEREST AltD SANCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT AN[D HIS COUNSEL) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER COMPELLING PAYMENT ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL (-Minute Order dated 11/20/2019 (sent to Mackay Sassan))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR ORDER COMPELLING PAYMENT BY DEFENDANT ACCORDING TO TERMS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ENTER JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT RALPH'S IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 30,000.00 PLUS INTEREST AltD SANCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT AN[D HIS COUNSEL) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER COMPELLING PAYMENT ...) of 11/20/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER COMPELLING PAYMENT ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketOrder (on the Court's Tentative Ruling); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Settlement Payment by Defendant, Interest on the payment at 10% per year, and request for sanctions; memo of points and authorities, declaration of Joseph Kang); Filed by ALFRED JESUS HERNANDEZ (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketReply (Plaintiffs' reply ti Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Compelling Payment by Defendant According to terms of Settlement Agreement, or in the Alternative to enter Judgment against Defendant Alfred Jesus Hernandez); Filed by OSCAR MAGANA (Legacy Party); BEATRIZ FALCON (Legacy Party); OSCAR DAIVD MAGANA (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR ORDER COMPELLING PAYMENT BY DEFENDANT ACCORDING TO TERMS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ENTER JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT RALPH'S IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 30,000.00 PLUS INTEREST AltD SANCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT AN[D HIS COUNSEL) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
148 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2012-01-13 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by EDGAR EDUARDO MAGANA (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: KC062564    Hearing Date: November 20, 2019    Dept: O

Plaintiffs Edgar Eduardo Magana, Beatriz Falcon, and Oscar Magana’s motion for enforcement of settlement agreement is CONTINUED for 90 days. The case file has been archived due to its age, and Court is not in receipt of any settlement agreement from Plaintiffs upon which to make its determination on their motion.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST COVINA CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF WEST COVINA is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURRELL, THOMAS C