This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 09:20:06 (UTC).

EDGAR ALEJANDRO GUTIERREZ VS THE VONS COMPANIES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/15/2015 EDGAR ALEJANDRO GUTIERREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE VONS COMPANIES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4144

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GUTIERREZ EDGAR ALEJANDRO

Defendants and Respondents

STEVE FODOR CONSTRUCTION

TODD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES

WEISER SECURITY SERVICES INC.

VONS COMPANIES THE

JCL BARRICADE COMPANY

DOES 1-150

SAFEWAY INC.

CHAVEZ CRYSTAL

EMPIRE DEMOLITION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MAURO FIORE JR.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ZIMET MARC J. ESQ.

ACKER & WHIPPLE

ZIMMERMAN BRIAN F. ESQ.

BOSSEN WILLIAM A. ESQ

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE; ETC

12/15/2015: PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE; ETC

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT EMPIRE DEMOLITION, INC.

1/8/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT EMPIRE DEMOLITION, INC.

Minute Order

5/16/2016: Minute Order

DEFENDANT THE VONS COMPANIES, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

5/20/2016: DEFENDANT THE VONS COMPANIES, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/16/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/16/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

6/16/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/16/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FFES

6/16/2016: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FFES

Minute Order

6/16/2016: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/16/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/16/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

8/5/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

8/15/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (PURSUANT TO THE DISCOVERY RESOLUTION STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES)

11/1/2016: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (PURSUANT TO THE DISCOVERY RESOLUTION STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES)

REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF/ DEFENDANT EDGAR ALEJANDRO GUTIERREZ AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

12/6/2016: REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF/ DEFENDANT EDGAR ALEJANDRO GUTIERREZ AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

DEFENDANT THE VONS COMPANIES, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF EDGAR ALEJANDRO GUTIERREZ

12/15/2016: DEFENDANT THE VONS COMPANIES, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF EDGAR ALEJANDRO GUTIERREZ

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/12/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Edgar Alejandro Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 32; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 32; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DEFENDANT THE VONS COMPANIES, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF EDGAR ALEJANDRO GUTIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Memorandum - Other; Filed by Vons Companies, The (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF/ DEFENDANT EDGAR ALEJANDRO GUTIERREZ AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (PURSUANT TO THE DISCOVERY RESOLUTION STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Edgar Alejandro Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2016
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (P1) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, WEISER SECURITY SERVICES, INC. TO GUTIERREZ COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Empire Demolition, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT EMPIRE DEMOLITION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Empire Demolition, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Edgar Alejandro Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JCL TRAFFIC SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where WEISER SECURITY SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where STEVE FODOR CONSTRUCTION, INC. is a litigant