This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 21:02:19 (UTC).

EDELIA ALEMAN ET AL VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 EDELIA ALEMAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1276

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Guardian Ad Litems and Petitioners

ALEMAN EDELIA

LOEZA DENISSE

LOEZA ISRAEL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

Minors

LOEZA RANDY

LOEZA ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF NEIL M. HOWARD

HOWARD NEIL MACY

Defendant Attorney

WEISS DAVID JAY

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/11/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

2/1/2018: Minute Order

ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

2/1/2018: ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE VIA STIPULATION; ETC

2/1/2018: PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE VIA STIPULATION; ETC

Minute Order

2/1/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

2/12/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO LIMIT TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS? EXPERT WITNESSES TO THOSE OPINIONS AND CONCLUSIONS TESTIFIED TO AT THEIR DEPOSITIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS

3/9/2018: MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO LIMIT TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS? EXPERT WITNESSES TO THOSE OPINIONS AND CONCLUSIONS TESTIFIED TO AT THEIR DEPOSITIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES REGARDING USE OF MEDICAL TREATISES, TEXTBOOKS, ARTICLES, AND/OR REFERENCES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PAMELA A. OW

3/9/2018: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES REGARDING USE OF MEDICAL TREATISES, TEXTBOOKS, ARTICLES, AND/OR REFERENCES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PAMELA A. OW

DECLARATION OF PAMELA A. OWEN, ESQ., RE DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION IN ILMINE

3/9/2018: DECLARATION OF PAMELA A. OWEN, ESQ., RE DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION IN ILMINE

MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5 OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO PROHIBIT EXAMINATION OR CROSS EXAMINATION REGARDING PERSONAL PRACTICES OF EXPERTS AND TREATING PHYSICIANS; DECLARATION OF PAMELA A. OWEN,

3/9/2018: MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5 OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO PROHIBIT EXAMINATION OR CROSS EXAMINATION REGARDING PERSONAL PRACTICES OF EXPERTS AND TREATING PHYSICIANS; DECLARATION OF PAMELA A. OWEN,

MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1 OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM INTRODUCING ANY EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PAM

3/9/2018: MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1 OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM INTRODUCING ANY EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PAM

MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4 OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE OF PRIOR, PRESENT OR FUTURE CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

3/14/2018: MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4 OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE OF PRIOR, PRESENT OR FUTURE CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

Minute Order

3/19/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANT'S EXPERTS WITNESSES

4/2/2018: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANT'S EXPERTS WITNESSES

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION IN LIMINE #1

4/2/2018: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION IN LIMINE #1

Minute Order

4/4/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/4/2018: Minute Order

JOINT WITNESS LIST

4/4/2018: JOINT WITNESS LIST

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • Notice of Ruling (ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL); Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For an order compellling the Defendant to pay the Settlement or Set this Case for Trial Immediately) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an order compellling the ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (For an order compellling the Defendant to pay the Settlement or Set this Case for Trial Immediately); Filed by Edelia Aleman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Declaration (In Opposition); Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
187 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2016
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Edelia Aleman (Plaintiff); Denisse Loeza (Plaintiff); Israel Loeza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Edelia Aleman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC611276    Hearing Date: December 18, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

edelia aleman, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

county of los angeles,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC611276

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petitions by Petitioner Edelia Aleman on behalf of Claimants Randy Loeza and Angel Loeza and is prepared to approve the settlements.

DATED: December 18, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISS DAVID JAY