This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 15:36:43 (UTC).

EDDIE MILES VS. ARIANA WILLIAMS, CRYSTAL L. WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 12/31/2012 EDDIE MILES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARIANA WILLIAMS, CRYSTAL L WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7174

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILES EDDIE

Defendants

WILLIAMS ARIANA

WILLIAMS CRYSTAL L.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PHILLIP P. DELUCA

Defendant Attorney

GATES O'DOHERTY GONTER & GUY LAW OFF.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

10/7/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

MOTION IN LIMINE 1 OF 4 DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE FACTS OF THE ACCIDENT EXCEPT FOR WITH RESPECT TO NATURE AND FORCE OF THE IMPACT

5/27/2014: MOTION IN LIMINE 1 OF 4 DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE FACTS OF THE ACCIDENT EXCEPT FOR WITH RESPECT TO NATURE AND FORCE OF THE IMPACT

Unknown

5/13/2013: Unknown

MOTION IN LIMINE 2 OF 4 DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING OR REFERRING TO ANY EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY

5/27/2014: MOTION IN LIMINE 2 OF 4 DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING OR REFERRING TO ANY EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY

Unknown

4/25/2013: Unknown

Minute Order

5/29/2013: Minute Order

Unknown

5/13/2013: Unknown

MOTION IN LIMINE 4 OF 4 DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE FROM THE COURTROOM ANY WITNESS NOT AT THE TIME UNDER EXAMINATION

5/27/2014: MOTION IN LIMINE 4 OF 4 DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE FROM THE COURTROOM ANY WITNESS NOT AT THE TIME UNDER EXAMINATION

Minute Order

6/16/2014: Minute Order

MOTION IN LIMINE 3 0? 4 DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO LIABILITY INSURANCE

5/27/2014: MOTION IN LIMINE 3 0? 4 DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO LIABILITY INSURANCE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/6/2013: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/15/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/23/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/15/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/9/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/24/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2014
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Motion in Limine (#2 TO PRECLUDE PLTF FROM INTRODUCING OR REFERRING TO ANY EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Motion in Limine (#1 TO EXCLUDE FACTS OF THE ACCIDENT EXCEPT FOR WITH RESPECT TO NATURE AND FORCE OF THE IMPACT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Motion in Limine (#4 TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO LIABILITY INSURANCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Motion in Limine (#3 TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO LIABILITY INSURANCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.