This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 19:36:58 (UTC).

EARL DUFFIE ET AL VS MANCHESTER 405 LLC

Case Summary

On 08/21/2015 EARL DUFFIE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MANCHESTER 405 LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL S. MURPHY and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2284

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL S. MURPHY

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DUFFIE EARL

LOPEZ-DUFFIE ANA

SMITH SHARROLL

SHARROLL SMITH

EARL DUFFIE

ANA LOPEZ-FUFFIE

LOPEZ-FUFFIE ANA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

MANCHESTER 405 LLC

DOES 1-50

PROGRESSIVE REAL ESTATE DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JOY M. JOHNSON ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF JOHNSON|OMOTOSHO LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FISCHLER MARVIN G. ESQ.

GITTLER & BRADFORD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR COMPENSATORY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES BY TENANT AGAINST LANDLORD: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY; ETC

8/21/2015: COMPLAINT FOR COMPENSATORY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES BY TENANT AGAINST LANDLORD: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY; ETC

SUMMONS

8/21/2015: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/9/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SPECIALLY APPEARING PARTY MANCHESTER 405, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES, ETC

9/24/2015: SPECIALLY APPEARING PARTY MANCHESTER 405, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES, ETC

SPECIALLY APPEARING PARTY MANCHESTER 405, LLC'S REQUEST THAT THE COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO QUASH

9/24/2015: SPECIALLY APPEARING PARTY MANCHESTER 405, LLC'S REQUEST THAT THE COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO QUASH

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION OF SAKURI BROWN AND DECLARATION OF JOY M. JOHNSON AND REQLEEST FOR SANCTIONS

10/13/2015: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION OF SAKURI BROWN AND DECLARATION OF JOY M. JOHNSON AND REQLEEST FOR SANCTIONS

SPECIALLY APPEARING PARTY MANCHESTER 405, LLC?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTION; DECLARATION OF MARVIN G. FISCHER IN REPLY

10/22/2015: SPECIALLY APPEARING PARTY MANCHESTER 405, LLC?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTION; DECLARATION OF MARVIN G. FISCHER IN REPLY

SPECIALLY APPEARING PARTY MANCHESTER 405, LLC?S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF JOY JOHNSON OFFERED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH

10/22/2015: SPECIALLY APPEARING PARTY MANCHESTER 405, LLC?S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF JOY JOHNSON OFFERED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING OCTOBER 28, 2015, HEARING DATE)

10/28/2015: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING OCTOBER 28, 2015, HEARING DATE)

Minute Order

10/28/2015: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Trial Setting Conference (Trial Setting Conference; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by EARL DUFFIE (Plaintiff); ANA LOPEZ-FUFFIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by Stipulated by all Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Answer; Filed by MANCHESTER 405, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by EARL DUFFIE (Plaintiff); ANA LOPEZ-FUFFIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by EARL DUFFIE (Plaintiff); ANA LOPEZ-FUFFIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by MANCHESTER 405, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • at 08:29 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Objection Document Filed; Filed by MANCHESTER 405, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Objection Document Filed; Filed by MANCHESTER 405, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2015
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by EARL DUFFIE (Plaintiff); ANA LOPEZ-FUFFIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by EARL DUFFIE (Plaintiff); ANA LOPEZ-FUFFIE (Plaintiff); Ana Lopez-Duffie (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR COMPENSATORY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES BY TENANT AGAINST LANDLORD: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.