Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 16:36:54 (UTC).

DYKSTRA SR, CALVIN LEE VS DYKSTRA, EMMA FRANCISCA

Case Summary

On 11/02/2016 DYKSTRA SR, CALVIN LEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DYKSTRA, EMMA FRANCISCA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SHORT, MICHELLE and ZAND, STEVE S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3806

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SHORT, MICHELLE

ZAND, STEVE S

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DYKSTRA CALVIN LEE

DYKSTRA CALVIN LEE SR

Respondent

DYKSTRA EMMA FRANCISCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

RULSKY JERRY

SANDS THOMAS D.

CATENA ANTHONY JOSEPH

Respondent Attorney

CASTER ANDREA MERRELL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • Witness List; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Exhibit List; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Trial Brief; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Proof of Service - Mail (Trial Brief, Witness List, Exhibit List ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Notice - Rejection (faxed 05/20/19 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • RFO/MTN - Spousal Support; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Witness List (For Bifurcated Trial ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Trial Brief (For The Bifurcated Trial On Determination Of The Parties' Date Of Separation ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2016
  • Declaration (seperate property - On Behalf of: Respondent: Dykstra, Emma ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Notice - Trial Setting Conference (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Dykstra, Emma - Scheduled & Notice Mailed on 2016-12-15 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Proof of Service - Mail (FL120,FL140,FL160,FL150 - On Behalf of: Respondent: Dykstra, Emma - Service Date on 2016-12-12 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Dykstra, Emma ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Dykstra, Emma ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Miscellaneous (Attachment to reesponse to request for accommodations by persons with disabilities ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Petition - Establish Parental Relationship; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Dykstra, Calvin ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RULSKY JERRY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATENA ANTHONY JOSEPH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDS THOMAS D