This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2021 at 16:24:11 (UTC).

DWIGHT BANKS VS NICOLAS NIGHTCLUB INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/11/2010 DWIGHT BANKS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against NICOLAS NIGHTCLUB INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1652

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANKS DWIGHT

Defendants and Respondents

ALDAWOOD CHAD

DOES 1-10

NICOLA'S NIGHTCLUB INC.

NICOLAS

SENOR WHITTER LLC

VIERA BEVERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDERS ROY L.

Defendant Attorney

KAPLAN JOSHUA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2011
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 42; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 42; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 42; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF JOSHUA KAPLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Nicola's Nightclub, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nicola's Nightclub, Inc. (Defendant); Chad Aldawood (Defendant); Senor Whitter, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, NICOLA'S NIGHTCLUB, INC., CHAD ALDAWOOD AND SENOR WHITTER, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES RE: VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS ON BASIS OF DISCRIMINATION IN PUBLIC ACCOMMODATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Dwight Banks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dwight Banks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nicolas is a litigant

Latest cases where BANKS DWIGHT is a litigant

Latest cases where NICOLA'S NIGHTCLUB INC. DBA NICOLA'S GENTLEMEN'S CLUB is a litigant