This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2020 at 07:17:24 (UTC).

DUONG T PHUNG ET AL VS ZHI XING ZHOU ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/16/2010 DUONG T PHUNG filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against ZHI XING ZHOU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN, MATTHEW ST. GEORGE and ALAN S. ROSENFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5653

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

ALAN S. ROSENFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PHUNG DUONG T.

PHUNG THU C.

Defendants

ABLE DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 600

ORTIZ DEMOLITION INC.

QT HOME INVESTMENT LLC

RANDALL R. KOENIG ESQ

SHENG DEVELOPMENT INC.

TIAN ZHAO PO

ZHOU ZHI XING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VAUGHAN BARRY C.

FOSS JOHN B. ESQ.

TURNER MICHAEL D.

Defendant Attorneys

HOLM ESTHER P. ESQ.

RESICH JOHN J. JR. A PROF. CORP.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

9/16/2010: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. VIOLATION OF STANDARDS FOR REIDCNTIAI CONSTRUCTION

9/16/2010: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. VIOLATION OF STANDARDS FOR REIDCNTIAI CONSTRUCTION

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/6/2010: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/6/2010: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/6/2010: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/6/2010: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/7/2010: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER-CONTRACT

10/21/2010: ANSWER-CONTRACT

Unknown

10/21/2010: Unknown

Unknown

10/21/2010: Unknown

ANSWER-CONTRACT

10/25/2010: ANSWER-CONTRACT

Unknown

11/4/2010: Unknown

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)

11/4/2010: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)

Unknown

11/4/2010: Unknown

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARINQ (SUPERIOR COURT)

11/4/2010: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARINQ (SUPERIOR COURT)

Minute Order

11/4/2010: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

11/9/2010: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/16/2010: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62; (OSC RE Dismissal; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Duong T. Phung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL REARING SET FOR APRIL 21, 2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Duong T. Phung (Plaintiff); Thu C. Phung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketReply/Response; Filed by Duong T. Phung (Plaintiff); Thu C. Phung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
269 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Duong T. Phung (Plaintiff); Thu C. Phung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Duong T. Phung (Plaintiff); Thu C. Phung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Duong T. Phung (Plaintiff); Thu C. Phung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. VIOLATION OF STANDARDS FOR REIDCNTIAI CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Duong T. Phung (Plaintiff); Thu C. Phung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RESICH JOHN J. JR. A PROF. CORP.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLM ESTHER P