This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2020 at 10:02:59 (UTC).

VALENTINA L. DUNTON SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

Case Summary

On 09/02/2010 VALENTINA L DUNTON SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LEVANAS, MICHAEL I., KLEIN, CLIFFORD, GREEN, LESLEY C., JOHNSON, BARBARA R. and BARRY, WILLIAM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4419

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LEVANAS, MICHAEL I.

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

GREEN, LESLEY C.

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

BARRY, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Petitioners

VALENTINA DUNTON L.

CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

Respondents and Defendants

VOLKSWAGEN DE MEXICO

VOLKSWAGEN AG

S.A. DE CV VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA

ALANT CORPORATION

DELMAR-MEARING LINDA

Not Classified By Court

DUNTON VALENTINA L.

SUPERIOR COURT

Trustee

WELLS FARGO BANK

Interested Party

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

ALLEN CHRISTINE MARIE

LINDSEY KATHERINE ANNE

Not Classified By Court and Trustee Attorneys

SHARON RANDOLPH MICHAEL

SHARON RANDOLPH M. ESQ

Other Attorneys

ALLEN CHRISTINE ESQ

YATES GARY S. ESQ

YOKA WALTER M. ESQ

WINSLOW WILLIAM L.

 

Court Documents

OTHER - PETITION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING LITIGATION SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST FOR DISABLIED INDIVIDUAL WITH SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS, APPOINTING TRUSTEE, AND FIXING TRUSTEE'S BOND

9/2/2010: OTHER - PETITION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING LITIGATION SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST FOR DISABLIED INDIVIDUAL WITH SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS, APPOINTING TRUSTEE, AND FIXING TRUSTEE'S BOND

Notice of Hearing (Probate)

9/9/2010: Notice of Hearing (Probate)

OTHER - CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE 'S JOINDER IN EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING, SETTLEMENT AMOUNT OF PROPOSED CORPUS OF TRUST

11/2/2010: OTHER - CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE 'S JOINDER IN EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING, SETTLEMENT AMOUNT OF PROPOSED CORPUS OF TRUST

OTHER - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION

11/18/2010: OTHER - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION

Minute Order

12/27/2011: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing (Probate)

1/9/2012: Notice of Hearing (Probate)

OTHER - ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF HOME MODIFICATIONS

1/9/2012: OTHER - ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF HOME MODIFICATIONS

OTHER - ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ACCOUNT CURRENT OF TRUSTEE FOR.....ECT

5/5/2014: OTHER - ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ACCOUNT CURRENT OF TRUSTEE FOR.....ECT

OTHER - SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING THE PAYMENT OF FEES TO THE BENEFICIARY'S SISTER AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

2/17/2015: OTHER - SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING THE PAYMENT OF FEES TO THE BENEFICIARY'S SISTER AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Minute Order

1/29/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/12/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/31/2016: Minute Order

Order - for approval of fourth and final account

1/25/2017: Order - for approval of fourth and final account

Order - Order Approving First Account

12/12/2017: Order - Order Approving First Account

Notice - Notice of death of beneficiary

9/14/2018: Notice - Notice of death of beneficiary

Supplement - First Supplement to Petition for Final Account and Reportof Trustee and Petition for Approval of Distribution; Petition for Approval of Attorney's Fees

6/13/2019: Supplement - First Supplement to Petition for Final Account and Reportof Trustee and Petition for Approval of Distribution; Petition for Approval of Attorney's Fees

Withdrawal - Dismissal of creditors claim and withdrawal of request for special notice

6/20/2019: Withdrawal - Dismissal of creditors claim and withdrawal of request for special notice

Rejected Proposed Order

8/11/2019: Rejected Proposed Order

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Ex Parte Petition For Final Dischare And Order ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketReceipt (Receipt on Distributions ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2019
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketOrder - Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketWithdrawal (Dismissal of creditors claim and withdrawal of request for special notice ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2010
  • DocketJoinder (IN EX PARTE APPLICATION Repres By: Yoka, Walter M., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Continental Automotive GmbH, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • DocketJoinder (AMENDED Filed By: Valentina, Dunton L., Petitioner Repres By: Winslow, William L., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • DocketJoinder (Filed By: Valentina, Dunton L., Petitioner Repres By: Winslow, William L., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • Docketin Stanley Mosk Dept. - 11, Levanas, Michael I., Presiding; Petition Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Filed By: Volkswagen Ag,, Defendant/Respondent Filed By: Volkswagen de Mexico, Defendant/Respondent Filed By: S.A. de CV Volkswagen Group of America, Defendant/Respondent Repres By: Yates, Gary S., Esq., Attorney for Defendant/Respondent )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketAccounting (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 10/15/2010 Filed By: Volkswagen Ag,, Defendant/Respondent Filed By: Volkswagen de Mexico, Defendant/Respondent Filed By: S.A. de CV Volkswagen Group of America, Defendant/Respondent Filed By: Alant Corporation, Defendant/Respondent Repres By: Yates, Gary S., Esq., Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Complaint Num: 2 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2010
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Filed By: Valentina, Dunton L., Petitioner Repres By: Winslow, William L., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketPetition - Acctg or Order in Crt Created Trust (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Uncontested 1st Hearing Date: 11/29/2010 Filed By: Valentina, Dunton L., Petitioner Repres By: Winslow, William L., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Continental Automotive GmbH is a litigant

Latest cases where ALANT CORP. DBA CIRCLE AUDI A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Volkswagen AG is a litigant