This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/05/2016 at 00:10:22 (UTC).

DUNG BOI TRAN VS. FRANKLIN ANAYA

Case Summary

On 04/04/2012 DUNG BOI TRAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRANKLIN ANAYA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERESA A. BEAUDET, DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN, JOHN P. DOYLE and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9224

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERESA A. BEAUDET

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

JOHN P. DOYLE

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAN DUNG BOI

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ANAYA FRANKLIN

DOES 1 TO 40 INCLUSIVE

ELGUEZABAL ROBERT

ELGUEZABAL RUDY

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-100

Others

PETER R. DIDONATO

MASRY & VITITOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DALE C. FRAILEY & ASSOCIATES

LAW OFFICES OF DALE C. FRAILEY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WESIERSKI & ZUREK

WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP

WASSON & ASSOCIATES INC.

CLASEN RAFFOW & RHOADS

CLASEN RAFFALOW & RHOADS

 

Court Documents

ORDER

4/21/2014: ORDER

NOTICE OF RULING RE:DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT FRANKLIN ANAYA?S MOTION TO COMPEL LUMBAR MRI WITH CONTRAST

2/14/2014: NOTICE OF RULING RE:DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT FRANKLIN ANAYA?S MOTION TO COMPEL LUMBAR MRI WITH CONTRAST

NOTICE OF RULING

4/24/2014: NOTICE OF RULING

DECLARATION OF CHADWICK F. SMITH, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTEFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENEDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL SECOND DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

11/27/2013: DECLARATION OF CHADWICK F. SMITH, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTEFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENEDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL SECOND DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

0RDER RE: DEFENDANT FRANKLIN ANAYA?S MOTION TO COMPEL SECOND DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF DUNG BOI TRAN

12/12/2013: 0RDER RE: DEFENDANT FRANKLIN ANAYA?S MOTION TO COMPEL SECOND DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF DUNG BOI TRAN

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT FRANKLIN ANAYA'S MOTION TO COMPEL LUMBAR MRI WITH CONTRAST

3/25/2014: NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT FRANKLIN ANAYA'S MOTION TO COMPEL LUMBAR MRI WITH CONTRAST

Minute Order

5/22/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLLM1NT AND OF APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION (CCP ?877.6(A)(2))

4/14/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLLM1NT AND OF APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION (CCP ?877.6(A)(2))

DECLARATION OF DUNG BOI TITAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENEDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL SECOND DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

11/27/2013: DECLARATION OF DUNG BOI TITAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENEDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL SECOND DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

6/27/2013: NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT FRANKLIN ANAYA?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND ALL PRETRIAL DEADLINES, OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME, SPECIALLY SETTING HEARING DATE

12/4/2013: DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT FRANKLIN ANAYA?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND ALL PRETRIAL DEADLINES, OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME, SPECIALLY SETTING HEARING DATE

Minute Order

4/17/2014: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/29/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER RE: EX PARTE

4/17/2014: ORDER RE: EX PARTE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

4/18/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

D I IIN I)A NI?/CROSS-I)E FEN PA NT FRANKLIN ANAYA?S REPLY TO PLA INTL FF?S OI?POSIRI ON TO MOTION TO COMPEL LUMBAR MIU WITH CONTR AST

1/31/2014: D I IIN I)A NI?/CROSS-I)E FEN PA NT FRANKLIN ANAYA?S REPLY TO PLA INTL FF?S OI?POSIRI ON TO MOTION TO COMPEL LUMBAR MIU WITH CONTR AST

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS ELGUEZABAL MOTION FOR ORDER ENFORCING PRIOR COURT ORDER, OR, COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO A LUMBAR MRI WITH CONTRAST

5/13/2014: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS ELGUEZABAL MOTION FOR ORDER ENFORCING PRIOR COURT ORDER, OR, COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO A LUMBAR MRI WITH CONTRAST

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPU?I?D MATTERS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL LUMBAR MIII WITH CONTRAST

1/31/2014: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPU?I?D MATTERS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL LUMBAR MIII WITH CONTRAST

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • Notice (OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Exhibits (JOINT LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Statement (OF THE CASE ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • List of Witnesses (JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Order Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Jury Instructions (JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF RONALD ZUREK; DECLARATION OF PETER DIDONATO ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS- COMPLAINT FILED BY RUDY AND ROBERT ELGUEZABAL ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Notice (OF RULING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2012
  • Summons Filed (ON CROSS COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • Proof of Service Filed Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Proof of Service Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.