This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 06:22:08 (UTC).

DUMALSKI LIVING TRUST, DATED JANUARY 28, 2009

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 DUMALSKI LIVING TRUST, DATED JANUARY 28, 2009 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHNSON, BARBARA R. and GREEN, LESLEY C.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6052

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

GREEN, LESLEY C.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUMALSKI DAVID

Not Classified By Court

DUMALSKI LIVING TRUST

Other

CHASTIAN DEBRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

VELASCO PAUL DAVID

RADCLIFFE RICHARD JAMES

Other Attorney

SAWDAY JENNIFER NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code) - Petition for Order Confirming Tust Assets and for Reformation of Contracts Based on Mistake.

11/10/2016: Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code) - Petition for Order Confirming Tust Assets and for Reformation of Contracts Based on Mistake.

Minute Order

11/16/2017: Minute Order

Supplement - First to Petition For Order Confirming Trust Assets And For Reformation of Contracts Based On Mistake

1/12/2017: Supplement - First to Petition For Order Confirming Trust Assets And For Reformation of Contracts Based On Mistake

Minute Order

3/23/2017: Minute Order

Notice - Continuance - Of Hearing

1/26/2017: Notice - Continuance - Of Hearing

PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

11/10/2016: PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

Notice - Hearing

12/20/2016: Notice - Hearing

Reply - Brief To Debra Chastain's Objections To First Amended Petition, Etc..

5/15/2017: Reply - Brief To Debra Chastain's Objections To First Amended Petition, Etc..

Order - Order Approving Settlement Agreement

9/12/2017: Order - Order Approving Settlement Agreement

Objection - Trust Petition - Debra's Chastain's Obj. to Pet. for Order confirming Trust Assets....

1/17/2017: Objection - Trust Petition - Debra's Chastain's Obj. to Pet. for Order confirming Trust Assets....

Objection - Trust Petition - To First Amended Petition Confirming Trust Assests, Reformation of Contracts based on mistake

5/1/2017: Objection - Trust Petition - To First Amended Petition Confirming Trust Assests, Reformation of Contracts based on mistake

Notice - Hearing

3/28/2017: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

5/25/2017: Minute Order

Notice - and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/29/2016: Notice - and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - First Amended Petition For Order Confirming Trust Assets.

3/28/2017: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - First Amended Petition For Order Confirming Trust Assets.

Notice - Hearing

7/18/2017: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

1/19/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/7/2017: Minute Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2018
  • DISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • in Probate Department 11, Green, Lesley C., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Request - Dismissal (Request for Dismissal ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Order (Order Approving Settlement Agreement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • in Probate Department 11, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) (Petition for Order Approving Settlement Agreement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • in Probate Department 11, Green, Lesley C., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Notice - Continuance (Of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • in Probate Department 11, Green, Lesley C., Presiding; Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Objection - Trust Petition (Debra's Chastain's Obj. to Pet. for Order confirming Trust Assets.... ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Supplement (First to Petition For Order Confirming Trust Assets And For Reformation of Contracts Based On Mistake ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Notice (and Acknowledgment of Receipt ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code) (Petition for Order Confirming Tust Assets and for Reformation of Contracts Based on Mistake. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less