Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 21:34:38 (UTC).

DULCE M OROZCO VS DIRT CHEAP, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/07/2015 DULCE M OROZCO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DIRT CHEAP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER and CARL J. WEST. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7931

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

CARL J. WEST

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

OROZCO DULCE M.

Defendants and Respondents

DCG FULFILLMENT

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

WORKFORCE ENTERPRISES WFE INC.

DIRT CHEAP INC. DBA DCG FULFILLMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

NOURMAND LAW FIRM APC THE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PRENOVOST NORMANDIN BERGH & DAWE

CAROTHERS DISANTE & FREUDENBERGER LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/3/2018: Minute Order

Other -

6/19/2018: Other -

Declaration

9/28/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

1/16/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/18/2018: Minute Order

Notice

1/24/2018: Notice

Order

2/22/2018: Order

Default Judgment

2/22/2018: Default Judgment

Minute Order

2/22/2018: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

2/22/2018: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RESTITUTION 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES; ETC

4/7/2015: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RESTITUTION 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES; ETC

Minute Order

12/30/2016: Minute Order

Other -

7/11/2017: Other -

Minute Order

7/14/2017: Minute Order

Brief

10/10/2017: Brief

Declaration

10/12/2017: Declaration

Declaration

10/12/2017: Declaration

Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

10/12/2017: Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 10; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Minute Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Minute Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Declaration (of Carole Thompson on behalf of settlement administrator CPT Group, Inc. regarding payments)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Declaration DECLARATION OF CAROLE THOMPSON ON BEHALF OF SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR CPT GROUP, INC. REGARDING PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DEFENDANT DIRT CHEAP, INC. DBA DCG FULFILLMENT'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Dirt Cheap Inc. dba DCG Fulfillment (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 322; Fairness Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by Dirt Cheap Inc. dba DCG Fulfillment (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Order -ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS, AND ENHANCEMENT AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2015
  • Status Report; Filed by Dulce M. Orozco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Workforce Enterprises Wfe, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Dulce M. Orozco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 322; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Dulce M. Orozco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Dulce M. Orozco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RESTITUTION 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Dulce M. Orozco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dirt Cheap I, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WORKFORCE ENTERPRISES WFE INC. is a litigant