This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2021 at 08:04:41 (UTC).

DUKE BRADBURY VS BEACH CITY INVESTIGATIONS & PROTECTION SERV

Case Summary

On 09/19/2013 DUKE BRADBURY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BEACH CITY INVESTIGATIONS PROTECTION SERV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1880

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRADBURY DUKE

Defendants

BEACH CITIES PROTECTIVE SERVICES INC.

BEACH CITY INVESTIGATIONS & PROTECTION

DOES 1 THROUGH 30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KESLUK SILVERSTEIN & JACOB PC

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

ROMERO LAW

LAW ROMERO

 

Court Documents

Default Judgment - -PLAINTIFF DUKE BRADBURY'S JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

12/6/2017: Default Judgment - -PLAINTIFF DUKE BRADBURY'S JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - -

12/5/2017: Minute Order - -

Other - - -DEPARTMENT 310 LAW AND MOTION RULINGS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR FEES, COSTS, AND INCENTIVE PAYMENT

12/5/2017: Other - - -DEPARTMENT 310 LAW AND MOTION RULINGS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR FEES, COSTS, AND INCENTIVE PAYMENT

Declaration - -DECLARATION OF JESSICA BARNETT REGARDING NOTICE AND SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION

11/22/2017: Declaration - -DECLARATION OF JESSICA BARNETT REGARDING NOTICE AND SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION

Notice - -PLAINTIFF DUKE BRADBURY'S NOTICE AND APPLICATION FOR FINAL DETERMINATION OF FAIRNESS OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (APPROVING REQUESTED AWARDS, INCLUDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS)

11/6/2017: Notice - -PLAINTIFF DUKE BRADBURY'S NOTICE AND APPLICATION FOR FINAL DETERMINATION OF FAIRNESS OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (APPROVING REQUESTED AWARDS, INCLUDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS)

Order - -ORDER RE: PRELIMINARY APPROVAL

8/18/2017: Order - -ORDER RE: PRELIMINARY APPROVAL

Notice - NOTICE OF SECOND SUBMISISION OF REVISED DOCUMENTS RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL:

7/11/2017: Notice - NOTICE OF SECOND SUBMISISION OF REVISED DOCUMENTS RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL:

Minute Order -

7/6/2017: Minute Order -

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISISION OF REVISED DOCUMENTS RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL:

6/15/2017: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISISION OF REVISED DOCUMENTS RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL:

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/16/2017: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Other - - PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMEN

5/11/2017: Other - - PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMEN

Stipulation and Order - FIFTH JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

11/10/2016: Stipulation and Order - FIFTH JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

Status Report - JOINT WORT INFORMAL DISCONTRY ICARING

10/27/2016: Status Report - JOINT WORT INFORMAL DISCONTRY ICARING

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF 1. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES (LABOR CODE ? 1194,1197); ETC

9/19/2013: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF 1. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES (LABOR CODE ? 1194,1197); ETC

SUMMONS -

9/19/2013: SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

9/7/2018: Minute Order -

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JESSICA BARNETT REGARDING DISBURSEMENT

7/24/2018: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JESSICA BARNETT REGARDING DISBURSEMENT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 14; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Duke Bradbury (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF JESSICA BARNETT REGARDING DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Duke Bradbury (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketDefault Judgment -PLAINTIFF DUKE BRADBURY'S JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 310; Fairness Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Docket-DEPARTMENT 310 LAW AND MOTION RULINGS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR FEES, COSTS, AND INCENTIVE PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketMinute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2014
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 310; Initial Status Conference (Initial Status Conference; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Duke Bradbury (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Duke Bradbury (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Duke Bradbury (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 310; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Duke Bradbury (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF 1. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES (LABOR CODE 1194,1197); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEACH CITIES PROTECTIVE SERVICES INC is a litigant