This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2016 at 21:39:15 (UTC).

DUFFIN, MICHAEL BARRETT - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 12/17/2008 DUFFIN, MICHAEL BARRETT - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4176

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUFFIN RICHARD W.

Claimants

ENCINO HOSPITAL

SHERMAN OAKS HOSPITAL

Not Classified By Court

ANSON BRIAN W.

SUPERIOR COURT

Decedent

DUFFIN MICHAEL BARRETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2010
  • Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Filed By: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • TERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2010
  • Receipt (Richard W. Duffin Filed By: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2010
  • Receipt (Diana D. Stanley Repres By: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Filed By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • Order - Final Distribution (Filed By: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • Termination of Supervision (Conversion Purpose)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • Inventory & Appraisal ($180,278.02 Filed By: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • Supplement (MATTERS TO CLEAR Filed By: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2009
  • Supplement (MATTERS TO CLEAR Filed By: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2009
  • Letters (Limited Authority NO BOND Filed by: Administrator Issued To:: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Limited Authority Filed by: Administrator Administrato: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • Order - Appointing Personal Representative (Limited Authority NO BOND Filed by: Administrator Administrato: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • Order - Appointing Personal Representative (Limited Authority NO BOND Filed by: Administrator Administrato: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • Affidavit (PUBLICAATION-LOS ANGELES TIMES Filed By: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • Creditor's Claim ($435.00 Filed by: Claimant )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • Proof of Publication (Filed by: Real Party in Interest )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • Notice - Administration to Creditors (Filed By: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • Supplement (Filed by: Petitioner in Pro Per )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • Petition - Letters of Administration (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Uncontested 1st Hearing Date: 01/20/2009 Filed By: Duffin, Richard W., Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENCINO HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SHERMAN OAKS HOSPITAL AN ACUTE CAE FACILITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant