This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 16:34:50 (UTC).

DUENEZ, JUAN JOSE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/15/2016 DUENEZ, JUAN JOSE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHNSON, BARBARA R. and KLEIN, CLIFFORD. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2937

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUENEZ MARGARET

Decedent

DUENEZ JUAN JOSE

Not Classified By Court

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

SETTLE KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WEISS DAVID E.

 

Court Documents

Petition for Probate (for deaths after 10/31/1984)

4/15/2016: Petition for Probate (for deaths after 10/31/1984)

Proof of Publication

5/2/2016: Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

5/5/2016: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Certification - Property Tax

5/10/2016: Certification - Property Tax

Waiver - (No Fee)

5/10/2016: Waiver - (No Fee)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

5/16/2016: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Minute Order

5/26/2016: Minute Order

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

6/8/2016: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Letters (Initial)

6/24/2016: Letters (Initial)

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

7/1/2016: Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

Inventory & Appraisal

10/21/2016: Inventory & Appraisal

Account - Final or Waiver - First & Final Account and Report, Petition for Settlement, etc

10/31/2016: Account - Final or Waiver - First & Final Account and Report, Petition for Settlement, etc

Minute Order

8/18/2017: Minute Order

Receipt - Receipt

10/13/2017: Receipt - Receipt

Receipt - Receipt

10/13/2017: Receipt - Receipt

Receipt - Receipt

10/13/2017: Receipt - Receipt

Receipt - Receipt

10/13/2017: Receipt - Receipt

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order - Ex Parte - Petition

10/13/2017: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order - Ex Parte - Petition

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Ex Parte - Petition )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketReceipt (Receipt )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketReceipt (Receipt )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketReceipt (Receipt )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketReceipt (Receipt )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketTERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketOrder - Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2016
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketCertification (Property Tax ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (1st Hearing Date: 05/26/2016 Filed By: Duenez, Margaret, Petitioner Repres By: Weiss, David E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISS DAVID E.